Consolidated
Lead case: 1:18-cv-06785

Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Virginia M Kendall
Case #: 1:22-cv-03492
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2022
Case in other court:Tennessee Western, 2:22-cv-02301
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 03, 2023 3:08 AM CST
Defendant
Dreamcatcher Broadcasting, LLC
Defendant
Fox Corporation
Defendant
Gray Media Group
Defendant
Griffin Communications, LLC
Defendant
Meredith Corporation
Defendant
NEXSTAR MEDIA GROUP, INC
Defendant
SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP, INC
Defendant
TEGNA INC
Defendant
The E.W. Scripps Company
Defendant
Tribune Broadcasting Company, LLC
Defendant
Tribune Media Company
Plaintiff
King Furs, Inc.
Represented By
Edward M. Bearman
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/07/2022 3:21 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3877191), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Bearman, Edward) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/7/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/7/2022.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/7/2022.]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/7/2022.]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/7/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
6 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) MDL No. 2867. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on July 6/2022.(agj) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/7/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal letter
Thursday, July 07, 2022
7 7 RECEIVED from Tennessee Western; Case Number 2:22-cv-02301 (gcy)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to counsel of record. (gcy, )
Related: [-]