Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:18-ap-00107
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2018
Terminated:Aug 01, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rapid Capital Finance, LLC d/b/a Rapid Capital Funding
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324
Represented By
Rapid Capital Finance, LLC d/b/a Rapid Capital Funding
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Thursday, August 01, 2019
24 24 order Dismiss and Close AP (Compromise, Conversion, Dismissal of BK Case) Thu 08/01 1:03 PM
Order Dismissing and Closing Adversary Proceeding 5:18-ap-107 closed . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
23 23 notice Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/31 9:45 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
22 22 order Compromise Wed 07/10 12:11 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 20
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
utility Calendar - Remove Tue 07/09 3:17 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Remove from Calendar - AP Settled Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.14 Scheduling Order. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due: n/a. Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due: 5/24/2019. Discovery due: 7/24/2019. Mediation Notification due 2/28/2019. Amendment(s) due by 6/24/2019. Motions due by 8/23/2019. Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2019. Trial date set for 10/2/2019 at 10:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. .
Friday, June 14, 2019
21 21 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Fri 06/14 11:43 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 20 Motion to Approve Compromise With Rapid Capital Finance, LLC
20 20 motion Compromise Fri 06/14 11:35 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise With Rapid Capital Finance, LLC filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
19 19 misc Generic Filing (Misc./Free Text - ECF) Wed 05/22 12:02 PM
Notice of Settlement filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2019
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Mon 03/25 1:01 PM
Deadline(s) Terminated/Expired Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.18 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Wed 03/13 10:29 AM
Deadline(s) Terminated. Parties may elect to mediate at a later date Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] ument no.14 Scheduling Order
Thursday, February 21, 2019
18 18 order Extend Time Thu 02/21 11:45 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Due by 3/22/2019. (Wiggins, Carrie)
Related: [-] 17
Monday, February 18, 2019
17 17 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Mon 02/18 1:13 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answers to Interrogatories and/or Request for Production filed by Charles N. Anderson Jr. on behalf of Rapid Capital Finance, LLC d/b/a Rapid Capital Funding. (Anderson, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 31, 2019
16 16 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 02/01 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 01/31/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, January 30, 2019
15 15 utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Wed 01/30 10:55 AM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] ument no.14 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
14 14 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/29 3:41 PM
Scheduling Order. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due: n/a. Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due: 5/24/2019. Discovery due: 7/24/2019. Mediation Notification due 2/28/2019. Amendment(s) due by 6/24/2019. Motions due by 8/23/2019. Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2019. Trial date set for 10/2/2019 at 10:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
13 13 admis Pre-Conference Report Wed 01/16 9:23 AM
Pre-Conference Report filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Rapid Capital Finance, LLC d/b/a Rapid Capital Funding, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 10 Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
12 12 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 12/18 2:03 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement filed by Charles N. Anderson Jr. on behalf of Rapid Capital Finance, LLC d/b/a Rapid Capital Funding. (Anderson, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 14, 2018
11 11 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sat 12/15 1:05 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 12/14/2018. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
10 10 order Directing Filing of Joint Report Wed 12/12 12:57 PM
Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report Pre-Conference Report due by 1/11/2019. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
9 9 utility Calendar - Schedule Tue 12/11 2:09 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/10 9:56 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Charles N. Anderson Jr. on behalf of Rapid Capital Finance, LLC d/b/a Rapid Capital Funding. (Anderson, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 29, 2018
7 7 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 11/30 1:09 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 11/29/2018. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
6 6 order Consent Order (No Motion) Tue 11/27 2:55 PM
Consent Stipulated Order of Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint. Answer deadline reset for 12/10/2018. (Brock, Anna)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2018
5 5 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sat 11/17 1:15 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 11/16/2018. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
4 4 order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed Wed 11/14 3:15 PM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer Due by 12/6/2018. . (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 29, 2018
3 3 misc Affidavit Mon 10/29 3:24 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Wednesday, October 10, 2018
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 10/10 4:59 PM
Summons Issued on Rapid Capital Finance, LLC d/b/a Rapid Capital Funding Answer Due 11/8/2018 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/10 4:58 PM
Adversary case 18-00107 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. against Rapid Capital Finance, LLC d/b/a Rapid Capital Funding (Fee Paid) (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A- H