Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-44642

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mark X Mullin
Case #: 4:18-ap-04167
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2018
Terminated:Dec 10, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mikeala Kellewood, as Co-Personal Representatives of the Wrongful Death Estate of Gwendy Kellewood
Mary Ellen Reilly, Wilkes & McHugh 15333 N. Pima Rd., Ste. 3000
Scottsdale, AZ 85260
Represented By
Mikeala Kellewood
contact info
Defendant
Sandra Vasquez, as Personal Representative of the Wrongful Death Estate of Petra Terrazas
Mary Ellen Reilly, Wilkes & McHugh 15333 N. Pima Rd., Ste. 3000
Scottsdale, AZ 85260
Represented By
Sandra Vasquez
contact info
Defendant
Herman Kellewood, as Co-Personal Representatives of the Wrongful Death Estate of Gwendy Kellewood
Mary Ellen Reilly, Wilkes & McHugh 15333 N. Pima Rd., Ste. 3000
Scottsdale, AZ 85260
Represented By
Herman Kellewood
contact info
Defendant
Michelle Purcell, as Next Friend of John Michael Purcell, Incapacitated
429 North Broadway P.O. Box 1747 P.O. Box 1747
Lexington, KY 40588
Represented By
Michelle Purcell
contact info
Defendant
Julie Moore, as Guardian of Dorothy Neighbors, Incapacited
Wilkes & McHugh, P.A. P.O. Box 1747
Lexington, KY 40588
Represented By
Julie Moore
contact info
Plaintiff
Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P.
1650 Galisteo Street
Santa Fe, NM 87505
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SF Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Raton Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suit 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gallup Health Facilities, L.P.
3720 Church Rock Street
Gallup, NM 87301
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Espanola Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Clayton Health Facilities, L.P.
419 Harding Street
Clayton, NM 88415
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Artesia Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stanton Health Facilities, L.P.
31 Derickson Lane
Stanton, KY 40380
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Springfield Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Somerset Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Preferred Care Inc.
5500 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P.
814 Old Ekron Road
Brandenburg, KY 40108
Represented By
Stephen A. McCartin
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Stephen A. McCartin
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Stephen A. McCartin
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Stephen A. McCartin
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P.
3876 Turkeyfoot Road
Elsmere, KY 41018
Represented By
Stephen A. McCartin
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P.
313 W. Main Street
Fordsville, KY 42343
Represented By
Stephen A. McCartin
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Franklin Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P.
662 Parkway Drive
Salyersville, KY 41465
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Henderson Health Facilities, L.P.
2500 North Elm Street
Henderson, KY 42420
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Irvine Health Facilities, L.P.
411 Bertha Wallace Drive
Irvine, KY 40336
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P.
2420 West Third Street
Owensboro, KY 42301
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paducah Health Facilities, L.P.
867 Meguire Avenue
Paducah, KY 42001
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Thursday, December 10, 2020
court Close adversary case Thu 12/10 11:05 AM
Adversary case 4:18-ap-4167 closed (Spelmon, T)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 26, 2020
37 37 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 11/26 11:32 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/26/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 36 Order dismissing case without prejudice (related document # []). Entered on 11/24/2020
Tuesday, November 24, 2020
36 36 order Dismiss adversary case Tue 11/24 2:05 PM
Order dismissing case without prejudice Related [+]. Entered on 11/24/2020 (Dozier, Bryan)
Related: [-] []
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
35 35 court Clerk's correspondence Tue 10/20 9:08 AM
Second Clerk's correspondence requesting Notice of Dismissal event to be filed from attorney for plaintiff. Related [+] Responses due by 10/30/2020. (Spelmon, T)
Related: [-] 33 Notice of Case Status filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. (RE: related document(s)32 Clerk's correspondence requesting Case Status from attorney for plaintiff. (RE: related document(s) Hearing NOT held on 5/23/2019. (RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 18-04167 Complaint by Preferred Care Inc., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P. against Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Herman Kellewood, Sandra Vasquez, Mikeala Kellewood. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Moore-Franklin Complaint # 2 Exhibit B - Moore-Bowling Green Complaint # 3 Exhibit C - Purcell Complaint # 4 Exhibit D - Kellewood Complaint # 5 Exhibit E - Vasquez Complaint # 6 Exhibit F - Scott Settlement Order). Nature(s) of suit: 72 (Injunctive relief - other). filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc., Plaintiff Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Plaintiff Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Plaintiff Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Plaintiff Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.) ***AMENDED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER TO BE UPLOADED***) Responses due by 5/7/2020.).
Thursday, September 17, 2020
34 34 court Clerk's correspondence Thu 09/17 2:10 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting Appropriate dismissal event to be filed in the case from attorney for plaintiff. Related [+] Responses due by 9/28/2020. (Spelmon, T)
Related: [-] 33 Notice of Case Status filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. (RE: related document(s)32 Clerk's correspondence requesting Case Status from attorney for plaintiff. (RE: related document(s) Hearing NOT held on 5/23/2019. (RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 18-04167 Complaint by Preferred Care Inc., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P. against Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Herman Kellewood, Sandra Vasquez, Mikeala Kellewood. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Moore-Franklin Complaint # 2 Exhibit B - Moore-Bowling Green Complaint # 3 Exhibit C - Purcell Complaint # 4 Exhibit D - Kellewood Complaint # 5 Exhibit E - Vasquez Complaint # 6 Exhibit F - Scott Settlement Order). Nature(s) of suit: 72 (Injunctive relief - other). filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc., Plaintiff Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Plaintiff Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Plaintiff Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Plaintiff Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.) ***AMENDED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER TO BE UPLOADED***) Responses due by 5/7/2020.). filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc., Plaintiff Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Plaintiff Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Plaintiff Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Plaintiff Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.
Thursday, May 07, 2020
33 33 notice Notice (generic) Thu 05/07 5:36 PM
Notice of Case Status filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. Related [+]. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-] 32 Clerk's correspondence requesting Case Status from attorney for plaintiff. (RE: related document(s) Hearing NOT held on 5/23/2019. (RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 18-04167 Complaint by Preferred Care Inc., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P. against Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Herman Kellewood, Sandra Vasquez, Mikeala Kellewood. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Moore-Franklin Complaint # 2 Exhibit B - Moore-Bowling Green Complaint # 3 Exhibit C - Purcell Complaint # 4 Exhibit D - Kellewood Complaint # 5 Exhibit E - Vasquez Complaint # 6 Exhibit F - Scott Settlement Order). Nature(s) of suit: 72 (Injunctive relief - other). filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc., Plaintiff Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Plaintiff Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Plaintiff Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Plaintiff Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.) ***AMENDED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER TO BE UPLOADED***) Responses due by 5/7/2020.
Monday, April 27, 2020
32 32 court Clerk's correspondence Mon 04/27 11:09 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting Case Status from attorney for plaintiff. Related [+] Responses due by 5/7/2020. (Spelmon, T)
Related: [-] Hearing NOT held on 5/23/2019. (RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 18-04167 Complaint by Preferred Care Inc., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P. against Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Herman Kellewood, Sandra Vasquez, Mikeala Kellewood. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Moore-Franklin Complaint # 2 Exhibit B - Moore-Bowling Green Complaint # 3 Exhibit C - Purcell Complaint # 4 Exhibit D - Kellewood Complaint # 5 Exhibit E - Vasquez Complaint # 6 Exhibit F - Scott Settlement Order). Nature(s) of suit: 72 (Injunctive relief - other). filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc., Plaintiff Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Plaintiff Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Plaintiff Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Plaintiff Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.) ***AMENDED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER TO BE UPLOADED***
Thursday, May 23, 2019
court Hearing not held Thu 05/23 11:09 AM
Hearing NOT held on 5/23/2019. Related [+] ***AMENDED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER TO BE UPLOADED*** (Rueter, Karyn)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-04167 Complaint by Preferred Care Inc., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P. against Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Herman Kellewood, Sandra Vasquez, Mikeala Kellewood. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Moore-Franklin Complaint # 2 Exhibit B - Moore-Bowling Green Complaint # 3 Exhibit C - Purcell Complaint # 4 Exhibit D - Kellewood Complaint # 5 Exhibit E - Vasquez Complaint # 6 Exhibit F - Scott Settlement Order). Nature(s) of suit: 72 (Injunctive relief - other). filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc., Plaintiff Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Plaintiff Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Plaintiff Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Plaintiff Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.
Thursday, March 28, 2019
31 31 court Hearing set/continued Thu 03/28 9:18 AM
Hearing reset Related [+] Trial Docket Call date set for 5/23/2019 at 09:00 AM at Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm.. (Rueter, Karyn)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-04167 Complaint by Preferred Care Inc., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P. against Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Herman Kellewood, Sandra Vasquez, Mikeala Kellewood. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Moore-Franklin Complaint # 2 Exhibit B - Moore-Bowling Green Complaint # 3 Exhibit C - Purcell Complaint # 4 Exhibit D - Kellewood Complaint # 5 Exhibit E - Vasquez Complaint # 6 Exhibit F - Scott Settlement Order). Nature(s) of suit: 72 (Injunctive relief - other). filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc., Plaintiff Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Plaintiff Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Plaintiff Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Plaintiff Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.
Friday, March 15, 2019
30 30 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 03/15 11:39 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/15/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Stipulation and Agreed Order to stand down on state-court lawsuits (related document11 ) Entered on 3/13/2019.
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
29 29 order Preliminary injunction Wed 03/13 3:32 PM
Stipulation and Agreed Order to stand down on state-court lawsuits Related [+] Entered on 3/13/2019. (Hurtado, Melissa)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, December 13, 2018
28 28 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 12/13 11:49 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/13/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Order denying motion to dismiss adversary proceeding (related document8 ) Entered on 12/11/2018.
27 27 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 12/13 11:49 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/13/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order granting motion for preliminary injunction (related document11 ) Entered on 12/11/2018.
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
26 26 order Dismiss adversary proceeding Tue 12/11 2:11 PM
Order denying motion to dismiss adversary proceeding Related [+] Entered on 12/11/2018. (Hurtado, Melissa)
Related: [-] 8
25 25 order Preliminary injunction Tue 12/11 2:09 PM
Order granting motion for preliminary injunction Related [+] Entered on 12/11/2018. (Hurtado, Melissa)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, November 30, 2018
24 24 court Clerk's correspondence Fri 11/30 3:38 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting an order from attorney for plaintiff. Related [+] Responses due by 12/10/2018. (Brown, D.)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for preliminary injunction Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc., Plaintiff Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Plaintiff Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Plaintiff Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Plaintiff Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.
23 23 court Clerk's correspondence Fri 11/30 3:19 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting an order from attorney for defendant. Related [+] Responses due by 12/10/2018. (Brown, D.)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendants Herman Kellewood, Mikeala Kellewood, Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Sandra Vasquez filed by Defendant Julie Moore, Defendant Michelle Purcell, Defendant Herman Kellewood, Defendant Sandra Vasquez, Defendant Mikeala Kellewood
Friday, November 16, 2018
22 22 court Transcript Fri 11/16 8:10 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 11/09/2018 (188 pages) RE: Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Injunctive Relief. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 02/14/2019. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. Related [+]. Transcript to be made available to the public on 02/14/2019.
Related: [-] Hearing held on 11/9/2018. (RE: related document(s)8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendants Herman Kellewood, Mikeala Kellewood, Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Sandra Vasquez filed by Defendant Julie Moore, Defendant Michelle Purcell, Defendant Herman Kellewood, Defendant Sandra Vasquez, Defendant Mikeala Kellewood) ***ORAL RULING TO BE RENDERED 11/14/18 AT 9:30*** (Rueter, Karyn) MODIFIED text on 11/13/2018., Hearing held on 11/9/2018. (RE: related document(s)11 Motion for preliminary injunction Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc., Plaintiff Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Plaintiff Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Plaintiff Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Plaintiff Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.) ***ORAL RULING TO BE RENDERED 11/14/18 AT 9:30*** (Rueter, Karyn) MODIFIED text on 11/13/2018.hling, Kathy
Thursday, November 15, 2018
21 21 court Transcript Thu 11/15 10:09 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 11/14/2018 (23 pages) RE: Ruling on Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Injunctive Relief. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 02/13/2019. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. Related [+]. Transcript to be made available to the public on 02/13/2019.
Related: [-] Hearing held on 11/14/2018. (RE: related document(s)11 Motion for preliminary injunction Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) ***INJUNCTION GRANTED THROUGH 3/14/19***, Hearing held on 11/14/2018. (RE: related document(s)8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendants Herman Kellewood, Mikeala Kellewood, Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Sandra Vasquez filed by Defendant Julie Moore, Defendant Michelle Purcell, Defendant Herman Kellewood, Defendant Sandra Vasquez, Defendant Mikeala Kellewood) ***DENIED***hling, Kathy
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
court Hearing held Wed 11/14 11:28 AM
Hearing held on 11/14/2018. Related [+] ***INJUNCTION GRANTED THROUGH 3/14/19*** (Rueter, Karyn)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for preliminary injunction Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Hearing held Wed 11/14 11:29 AM
Hearing held on 11/14/2018. Related [+] ***DENIED*** (Rueter, Karyn)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendants Herman Kellewood, Mikeala Kellewood, Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Sandra Vasquez filed by Defendant Julie Moore, Defendant Michelle Purcell, Defendant Herman Kellewood, Defendant Sandra Vasquez, Defendant Mikeala Kellewood
Friday, November 09, 2018
20 20 court Hearing set/continued Tue 11/13 8:12 AM
Hearing reset Related [+] Hearing to be held on 11/14/2018 at 09:30 AM Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm. for8 and for11 , (Rueter, Karyn)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendants Herman Kellewood, Mikeala Kellewood, Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Sandra Vasquez filed by Defendant Julie Moore, Defendant Michelle Purcell, Defendant Herman Kellewood, Defendant Sandra Vasquez, Defendant Mikeala Kellewood,11 Motion for preliminary injunction Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc., Plaintiff Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Plaintiff Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Plaintiff Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Plaintiff Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.
court Hearing held Tue 11/13 8:09 AM
Hearing held on 11/9/2018. Related [+] ***ORAL RULING TO BE RENDERED 11/14/18 AT 9:30*** (Rueter, Karyn) MODIFIED text on 11/13/2018 (Rueter, Karyn)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendants Herman Kellewood, Mikeala Kellewood, Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Sandra Vasquez filed by Defendant Julie Moore, Defendant Michelle Purcell, Defendant Herman Kellewood, Defendant Sandra Vasquez, Defendant Mikeala Kellewood
court Hearing held Tue 11/13 8:12 AM
Hearing held on 11/9/2018. Related [+] ***ORAL RULING TO BE RENDERED 11/14/18 AT 9:30*** (Rueter, Karyn) MODIFIED text on 11/13/2018 (Rueter, Karyn)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for preliminary injunction Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc., Plaintiff Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Plaintiff Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Plaintiff Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Plaintiff Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.
Wednesday, November 07, 2018
19 19 notice Notice (generic) Wed 11/07 2:36 PM
Notice of Death filed by Defendant Michelle Purcell. (Ribaudo, Nancy)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice (generic) Wed 11/07 2:34 PM
Notice of Death filed by Defendant Julie Moore. (Ribaudo, Nancy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
17 17 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Tue 11/06 6:26 PM
Witness and Exhibit List filed by Defendants Herman Kellewood, Mikeala Kellewood, Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Sandra Vasquez Related [+]. (Ribaudo, Nancy)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding ,11 Motion for preliminary injunction Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties
16 16 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Tue 11/06 3:40 PM
Witness and Exhibit List for Hearing on Motion for Injunctive Relief filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. Related [+]. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for preliminary injunction Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties ,11 Motion for preliminary injunction Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties
Friday, November 02, 2018
15 15 notice Notice of hearing Fri 11/02 5:00 PM
Amended Notice of hearing on Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 11/9/2018 at 01:30 PM Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm. for11 and for2 , (Bales, Melina)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for preliminary injunction Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),11 Motion for preliminary injunction Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
14 14 notice Notice of hearing Fri 11/02 1:03 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendants Herman Kellewood, Mikeala Kellewood, Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Sandra Vasquez Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 11/9/2018 at 01:30 PM Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm. for8 , (Ribaudo, Nancy)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Julie Moore, Defendant Michelle Purcell, Defendant Herman Kellewood, Defendant Sandra Vasquez, Defendant Mikeala Kellewood
Thursday, November 01, 2018
13 13 misc Support/supplemental document Thu 11/01 5:24 PM
Support/supplemental document to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Herman Kellewood, Mikeala Kellewood, Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Sandra Vasquez Related [+]. (Ribaudo, Nancy)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding
12 12 motion Expedite hearing Thu 11/01 2:28 PM
Motion for expedited hearin Related [+] filed by Defendants Herman Kellewood, Mikeala Kellewood, Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Sandra Vasquez (Ribaudo, Nancy)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
11 11 motion Preliminary injunction Wed 10/31 4:49 PM
Motion for preliminary injunction Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 answer Objection Wed 10/31 4:47 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Defendants Herman Kellewood, Mikeala Kellewood, Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Sandra Vasquez. (Ribaudo, Nancy)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for preliminary injunction Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc., Plaintiff Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Plaintiff Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Plaintiff Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Plaintiff Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.
9 9 misc Brief Wed 10/31 4:44 PM
Brief in support filed by Defendants Herman Kellewood, Mikeala Kellewood, Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Sandra Vasquez Related [+]. (Ribaudo, Nancy)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding
8 8 motion Dismiss adversary proceeding Wed 10/31 4:40 PM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendants Herman Kellewood, Mikeala Kellewood, Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Sandra Vasquez (Ribaudo, Nancy)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Amended complaint Wed 10/31 4:36 PM
Amended complaint by Mark C. Moore on behalf of Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. against Karen Steinhauser, Herman Kellewood, Mikeala Kellewood, Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Sandra Vasquez No change to nature of suit. Related [+]. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-04167 Complaint by Preferred Care Inc., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P. against Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Herman Kellewood, Sandra Vasquez, Mikeala Kellewood. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Moore-Franklin Complaint # 2 Exhibit B - Moore-Bowling Green Complaint # 3 Exhibit C - Purcell Complaint # 4 Exhibit D - Kellewood Complaint # 5 Exhibit E - Vasquez Complaint # 6 Exhibit F - Scott Settlement Order). Nature(s) of suit: 72 (Injunctive relief - other). filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc., Plaintiff Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Plaintiff Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Plaintiff Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Plaintiff Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Moore-Franklin Complaint
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Moore-Bowling Green Complaint
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Purcell Complaint
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Kellewood Complaint
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Vasquez Complaint
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Steinhauser Complaint
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Scott Settlement Order
Friday, October 12, 2018
crditcrd none Fri 10/12 9:52 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-04167 mxm) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 25747476, amount $ 350.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Thursday, October 11, 2018
6 6 notice Notice of hearing Thu 10/11 2:59 PM
Notice of hearing for November 9, 2018 at 1:00 PM filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 11/9/2018 at 01:00 PM Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm. for2 , (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc., Plaintiff Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Plaintiff Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Plaintiff Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Plaintiff Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.
5 5 misc Support/supplemental document Thu 10/11 2:58 PM
Support/supplemental document Declaration of Robert J. Riek in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. Related [+]. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Motion for preliminary injunction Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties
4 4 court Summons issued Thu 10/11 9:55 AM
Summons issued on Herman Kellewood Answer Due 11/13/2018; Mikeala Kellewood Answer Due 11/13/2018; Julie Moore Answer Due 11/13/2018; Michelle Purcell Answer Due 11/13/2018; Sandra Vasquez Answer Due 11/13/2018 (Calfee, J.)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Thu 10/11 9:52 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 3/28/2019 at 09:00 AM at Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm.. Entered on 10/11/2018 (Calfee, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Preferred Care Inc., Plaintiff Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Plaintiff Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Plaintiff Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Plaintiff Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities, L.P., Plaintiff SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Plaintiff Silver City Health Facilities, L.P.
Wednesday, October 10, 2018
2 2 motion Preliminary injunction Wed 10/10 5:48 PM
Motion for preliminary injunction Motion for Injunctive Relief Staying Proceedings Against Non-Debtor Third Parties filed by Plaintiffs Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Preferred Care Inc., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/10 5:40 PM
Adversary case 18-04167 Complaint by Preferred Care Inc., Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P., Brandenburg Health Facilities, L.P., Cadiz Health Facilities, L.P., Campbellsville Health Facilities, L.P., Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P., Elsmere Health Facilities, L.P., Fordsville Health Facilities, L.P., Franklin Health Facilities, L.P., Hardinsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Henderson Health Facilities, L.P., Irvine Health Facilities, L.P., Morganfield Health Facilities, L.P., Owensboro Health Facilities, L.P., Paducah Health Facilities, L.P., Pembroke Health Facilities, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Kenwood, L.P., Richmond Health Facilities - Madison, L.P., Salyersville Health Facilities, L.P., Somerset Health Facilities, L.P., Springfield Health Facilities, L.P., Stanton Health Facilities, L.P., Artesia Health Facilities, L.P., Bloomfield Health Facilities, L.P., Clayton Health Facilities, L.P., Desert Springs Health Facilities, L.P., Espanola Health Facilities, L.P., Gallup Health Facilities, L.P., Lordsburg Health Facilities, L.P., Pinnacle Health Facilities XXXIII, L.P., Raton Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities, L.P., SF Health Facilities-Casa Real, L.P., Silver City Health Facilities, L.P. against Julie Moore, Michelle Purcell, Herman Kellewood, Sandra Vasquez, Mikeala Kellewood. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 72 (Injunctive relief - other). (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Moore-Franklin Complaint
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Moore-Bowling Green Complaint
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Purcell Complaint
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Kellewood Complaint
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Vasquez Complaint
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Scott Settlement Order