Gindi v. Bennett
Original Case: 1:15-cv-06475
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-03057 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Oct 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2019 4:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dion Thomas
|
|
Defendant
New York City Commission on Human Rights
|
|
Defendant
Gayle Donowitz, of Canarsie High School and the body of Canarsie High School
|
|
Defendant
Marc Sclar, of intermediate School 303 and the Body of Intermediate School 303
|
|
Defendant
Accetura, of franklin Delanore Roosevelt High School and (the body of FDR)
|
|
Defendant
Elaine Jacobson, Of Sheepshead Bay High School and the Body of Sheepshead Bay High School
|
|
Defendant
Carter
|
|
Defendant
Geraldine Pomponio
|
|
Defendant
Reesa Levy
|
|
Defendant
John Cayton
|
|
Defendant
Grace Lewis
|
|
Defendant
Maritza Soto
|
|
Defendant
Teri Di' Ambrosio
|
|
Defendant
Teri Amass
|
|
Defendant
Mario Ford
|
|
Defendant
Anna Garner
|
|
Defendant
Charles Turner, For the body of the United Federation of Teachers
|
|
Defendant
Howard Schoor
|
|
Defendant
Michael Mulgrew
|
|
Defendant
Judge Bernadette F. Bayne, The body of the Supreme Court Kings County Civil Term
|
|
Defendant
John O'Mahoney
|
|
Defendant
Catherine Morrissey, for Sheepshead Bay High School and the body of Sheepshead Bay High School
|
|
Defendant
Hubert Guscott
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Ann Garner, DOE and the Body of the Department of Education
|
|
Defendant
Thomas Bennett, UFT and the Body of the UFT
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York City Department of Education
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Lisa Gindi
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Oriana Vigliottie, NYSUT Counsel
|
|
Respondent
John P Guyette, Assistant Corporate Counsel
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2019 4:32 AM EDT |
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Lisa Gindi, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2413314] 18-3057 [Entered: 10/18/2018 02:07 PM] | |
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2413328] 18-3057 [Entered: 10/18/2018 02:16 PM] | |
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() |