New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Ann M Donnelly
Referred: Ramon E Reyes, Jr
Case #: 1:15-cv-06475
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2015
Terminated:Sep 27, 2018
Last checked: Monday May 02, 2016 6:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Gayle Donowitz
Defendant
Marc Sclar
Defendant
Howard Schoor
Defendant
Geraldine Pomponio
Defendant
John O'Mahoney
Defendant
Michael Mulgrew
Defendant
Catherine Morrissey
Defendant
Grace Lewis
Defendant
Reesa Levy
Defendant
Elaine Jacobson
Defendant
Maritza Soto
Defendant
Anna Garner
Defendant
Mario Ford
Defendant
Ms. Teri Di'Ambrosio
Defendant
John Cayton
Defendant
Carter
Defendant
Judge Bernadette Bayne
Defendant
Ms. Teri Amass
Defendant
Accetura
Defendant
Hubert Guscott
Defendant
Dion Thomas
Defendant
Dr. Ann Garner
Defendant
Mr. Thomas Bennett
Defendant
Charles Turner
Plaintiff
Lisa Gindi
75-25 153rd Street, PH 23
Kew Garden Hills, NY 11367
Respondent
Ms. Oriana Vigliottie
Respondent
Mr. John P Guyette

GPO Feb 01 2016
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiff Lisa Gindi, proceeding pro se, filed the instant complaint alleging violations of Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964, 42 U.S.C. § 2000e et seq. ("Title VII"), the Age Discrimination in Employment Act, 29 U.S.C. § 621 et seq. ("the ADEA''), and the Americanswith Disabilities Act, 42 U.S.C. § 12101 et seq. ("ADA"). Along with her complaint, plaintiff files a request to proceed informa pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. Plaintiffs request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED solely for the purpose of the instant order. For the reasons stated below, plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, or the instant action shall be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). So Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 1/29/2016. (Gillespie, Saudia)
GPO Apr 13 2016
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Gindi is granted one last opportunity to submit a second amended complaint. If Gindi fails to submit a second amended complaint within thirty (30) days or fails to properly plead her claims as directed by this Order, the Court shall enter judgment dismissing the action. No summons shall issue at this time and all further proceedings shall be stayed for thirty (30) days. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk or Court is directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to theplaintiff pro se and note the mailing on the docket. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 4/13/2016. (Taronji, Robert)
GPO Jun 20 2016
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Gindi's claims, including the newly added claims relating to the state court action, against all defendants with the exception of the New York City Department of Education are dismissed. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). No summons shall issue as to these defendants, and it is further; ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all parties, with the exception of the New York City Department of Education, from this action, and it is further; ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is hereby directed to serve the summons, complaint, first amended complaint, second amended complaint, the Court's Orders dated February 1, 2016, and April 13, 2016, and the instant Order upon defendant the New York City Department ofEducation. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk or Court is directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the plaintiff pro se and note the mailing on the docket.Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 6/17/2016. (Taronji, Robert)
GPO Jan 05 2017
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 13 Motion for Reconsideration: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, Gindi's motion for reconsideration (Doc. No. 13) is denied. Gindi's request for a conference and her request for permission to file a motion for summary judgment is denied without prejudice to renew the applications at a later stage of the action. This action is recommitted to the assigned Magistrate Judge for all pre-trial proceedings, including addressing any issues with service of the remaining defendants, as well as plaintiffs request for default judgment (Doc. No. 21). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to plaintiff Lisa Gindi, pro se, and note the mailing on the docket. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 1/4/2017. (Mauskopf, Roslynn)
GPO Sep 27 2018
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot 44 Motion to Strike: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, defendant DOE's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 44) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment pursuant to this Order, and to close the case. The Clerk or Court is further directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order and the accompanying judgment to pro se plaintiff Lisa Gindi, and note the mailing on the docket. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 9/26/2018. (Zhu, Angela)
GPO Sep 27 2018
JUDGMENT in favor of New York City Department of Education against Lisa Gindi.Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 9/26/2018. (Zhu, Angela)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
98 98 appeal USCA Appeal Fees Thu 04/10 11:46 AM
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 605 receipt number 100020207 re97 Notice of Appeal filed by Lisa Gindi (VJ)
Related: [-]
appeal Electronic Index to Record on Appeal Thu 04/10 11:47 AM
Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals.97 Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (VJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
97 97 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 04/10 11:44 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Order on Motion to Reopen Case, by Lisa Gindi. (VJ)
Related: [-]