Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-10745

Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shelley D Rucker
Case #: 1:18-ap-01044
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2018
Terminated:Mar 25, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
James L. Henry, Jr.
412 Broad Street
Chattanooga, TN 37402
Represented By
James L. Henry, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerrold D. Farinash, Trustee
Farinash & Stofan 100 West ML King Blvd., Suite 816
Chattanooga, TN 37402
Represented By
Jerrold D. Farinash
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2022
Memorandum Opinion. SDR (RE: related document(s)71 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Jerrold D. Farinash). (cfy)
GPO Jul 05 2022
Memorandum Opinion. SDR (RE: related document(s) 82 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant James L. Henry, 123 Motion to Amend filed by Defendant James L. Henry, 126 Miscellaneous Motion filed by Plaintiff Jerrold D. Farinash). (cam)
GPO Aug 18 2022
Memorandum Opinion and Order. SDR (RE: related document(s)166 Document filed by Plaintiff Jerrold D. Farinash). The Court resolves plaintiffs objection by directing the Clerk of the Court to proceed with its standard practice for transmittal of the record on appeal, which will include the text for each designated docket entry as it appears in the docket. The transmittal will include Docket Numbers 165 through 167 along with this Order. (cfy)
GPO May 15 2023
Memorandum Opinion. SDR (RE: related document(s)202 Miscellaneous Motion filed by Plaintiff Jerrold D. Farinash). (cfy)
GPO Mar 05 2024
Memorandum Opinion. SDR (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jerrold D. Farinash). (cfy)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, September 16, 2024
234 234 notice Notice (generic) Mon 09/16 4:01 PM
Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Jerrold D. Farinash on behalf of Plaintiff Jerrold D. Farinash. (Farinash, Jerrold)
Related: [-]