Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-34169

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Harlin Dewayne Hale
Case #: 3:18-ap-03329
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2018
Terminated:Apr 10, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
AT&T
Represented By
Defendant
AT&T Corp.
Represented By
AT&T Corp.
contact info
Defendant
AT&T Mobility II, LLC
Represented By
AT&T Mobility II, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis Faulkner, The Creditor Trustee
Represented By
John J. Kane
Kane Russell Coleman Logan PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
court Close adversary case Wed 04/10 8:54 AM
Adversary case 3:18-ap-3329 closed (Dugan, S.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding Thu 03/28 3:53 PM
Notice of dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner. (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
11 11 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 02/22 11:39 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/22/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order establishing streamlined procedures governing adversary proceedings commenced by Trustee (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner). Entered on 2/20/2019
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
10 10 7 pgs order Order (generic) Wed 02/20 10:41 AM
Order establishing streamlined procedures governing adversary proceedings commenced by Trustee Related [+]. Entered on 2/20/2019 (Banks, Courtney)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner
Friday, November 16, 2018
9 9 cmp Summons service executed Fri 11/16 4:52 PM
Summons service executed on AT&T Mobility II, LLC 11/5/2018 (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Summons service executed Fri 11/16 4:50 PM
Summons service executed on AT&T Corp. 11/5/2018 (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Summons service executed Fri 11/16 4:49 PM
Summons service executed on AT&T 11/5/2018 (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 29, 2018
6 6 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Mon 10/29 1:46 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 3/25/2019 at 10:30 AM at Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm. Trial Week 4/1/19. Entered on 10/29/2018 (Green, Shanette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner
5 5 court Summons issued Mon 10/29 1:37 PM
Summons issued on AT&T Answer Due 11/28/2018; AT&T Corp. Answer Due 11/28/2018; AT&T Mobility II, LLC Answer Due 11/28/2018 (Green, Shanette)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Adversary proceeding cover sheet Mon 10/29 11:29 AM
Adversary proceeding cover sheet filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner Related [+]. (Kane, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
3 3 misc Adversary proceeding cover sheet Mon 10/29 11:25 AM
Adversary proceeding cover sheet filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner Related [+]. (Kane, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 court Clerk's correspondence Mon 10/29 9:51 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting amended cover sheet to include party type for defendant from attorney for plaintiff. Related [+] Responses due by 11/8/2018. (Dugan, S.)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-03329 Complaint by Dennis Faulkner, The Creditor Trustee against AT&T, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Adversary Cover Sheet). Nature(s) of suit: 12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference). filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner
Friday, October 26, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/26 2:31 PM
Adversary case 18-03329 Complaint by Dennis Faulkner, The Creditor Trustee against AT&T, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 Related [+]. (Kane, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet