Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Harlin Dewayne Hale
Case #: 3:16-bk-34169
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2016
Dismissed:Mar 03, 2021
Terminated:Mar 19, 2021
Plan Confirmed:Sep 29, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
ValuePart, Incorporated
9804 Chartwell Dr
Dallas, TX 75243-8304
Represented By
Marcus Alan Helt
Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP
contact info
Mark C. Moore
Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP
contact info
Thomas C. Scannell
Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Friday, March 19, 2021
court Close adversary case Fri 03/19 11:20 AM
Adversary case 3:18-ap-3328 closed (Dugan, S.)
Related: [-]
court Close adversary case Fri 03/19 11:26 AM
Adversary case 3:18-ap-3335 closed (Dugan, S.)
Related: [-]
court Close bankruptcy case Fri 03/19 11:43 AM
Bankruptcy case closed. Pursuant to LBR 9070-1, any exhibits that were admitted by the Court may be claimed and removed from the Clerks Office during the 60-day period following final disposition of a case by the attorney or party who introduced the exhibits. Any exhibit not removed within the 60-day period may be destroyed or otherwise disposed of by the Bankruptcy Clerk. (Dugan, S.)
Related: [-]