Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-34169

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Harlin Dewayne Hale
Case #: 3:18-ap-03333
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2018
Terminated:Feb 06, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
FMC
Represented By
Plaintiff
Dennis Faulkner, The Creditor Trustee
Represented By
John J. Kane
Kane Russell Coleman Logan PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Friday, February 22, 2019
11 11 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 02/22 11:39 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/22/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order establishing streamlined procedures governing adversary proceedings commenced by Trustee (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner). Entered on 2/20/2019
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
10 10 7 pgs order Order (generic) Wed 02/20 10:45 AM
Order establishing streamlined procedures governing adversary proceedings commenced by Trustee Related [+]. Entered on 2/20/2019 (Banks, Courtney)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
court Close adversary case Wed 02/06 12:09 PM
Adversary case 3:18-ap-3333 closed (Dugan, S.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding Tue 01/29 4:25 PM
Notice of dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner. (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 28, 2019
8 8 cmp Summons service executed Mon 01/28 3:04 PM
Summons service executed on FMC 11/28/2018 (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 29, 2018
7 7 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Mon 10/29 2:13 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 3/25/2019 at 10:30 AM at Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm. Trial week 4/1/19. Entered on 10/29/2018 (Green, Shanette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner
6 6 court Summons issued Mon 10/29 2:12 PM
Summons issued on FMC Answer Due 11/28/2018 (Green, Shanette)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Adversary proceeding cover sheet Mon 10/29 11:33 AM
Adversary proceeding cover sheet filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner Related [+]. (Kane, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
4 4 court Clerk's correspondence Mon 10/29 10:31 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting amended cover sheet to include party type for defendant from attorney for plaintiff. Related [+] Responses due by 11/8/2018. (Dugan, S.)
Related: [-] 3 Adversary proceeding cover sheet filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner, The Creditor Trustee (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint). filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner
Friday, October 26, 2018
3 3 misc Adversary proceeding cover sheet Fri 10/26 3:29 PM
Adversary proceeding cover sheet filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner, The Creditor Trustee Related [+]. (Kane, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 misc Support/supplemental document Fri 10/26 3:28 PM
Support/supplemental document - Exhibit A to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner, The Creditor Trustee Related [+]. (Kane, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/26 2:50 PM
Adversary case 18-03333 Complaint by Dennis Faulkner, The Creditor Trustee against FMC a/k/a Friction Marketing Co. Ltd.. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 Related [+]. (Kane, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference