Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-34169

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Harlin Dewayne Hale
Case #: 3:18-ap-03337
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2018
Terminated:Sep 10, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Superior Tire & Rubber Corp.
Represented By
Superior Tire & Rubber Corp.
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis Faulkner, The Creditor Trustee
Represented By
John J. Kane
Kane Russell Coleman Logan PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
court Close adversary case Tue 09/10 4:54 PM
Adversary case 3:18-ap-3337 closed (Dugan, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding Mon 09/09 5:10 PM
Notice of dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner. (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
court Hearing held Tue 08/27 4:19 PM
Hearing held on 8/27/2019. Related [+] (SETTLED; CASE TO BE DISMISSED.) (Green, Shanette)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-03337 Complaint by Dennis Faulkner, The Creditor Trustee against Superior Tire & Rubber Corp.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Adversary Cover Sheet). Nature(s) of suit: 12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference).
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of hearing Tue 08/20 5:02 PM
Notice of hearing - Status Conference filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 8/27/2019 at 01:30 PM at Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm. (Kane, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner
Thursday, July 25, 2019
10 10 court Clerk's correspondence Thu 07/25 11:52 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting Case Status from attorney for plaintiff. Responses due by 8/5/2019. (Dugan, S.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
9 9 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 02/22 11:39 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/22/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order establishing streamlined procedures governing adversary proceedings commenced by Trustee (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner). Entered on 2/20/2019
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
8 8 7 pgs order Order (generic) Wed 02/20 10:48 AM
Order establishing streamlined procedures governing adversary proceedings commenced by Trustee Related [+]. Entered on 2/20/2019 (Banks, Courtney)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
7 7 answer Answer to complaint Tue 01/29 11:15 AM
Answer to complaint filed by Superior Tire & Rubber Corp.. (Pailet, Harrell)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2018
6 6 cmp Summons service executed Fri 11/16 5:01 PM
Summons service executed on Superior Tire & Rubber Corp. 11/5/2018 (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 29, 2018
5 5 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Mon 10/29 2:35 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 3/25/2019 at 10:30 AM at Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm. Trial week 4/1/19. Entered on 10/29/2018 (Green, Shanette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner
4 4 court Summons issued Mon 10/29 2:34 PM
Summons issued on Superior Tire & Rubber Corp. Answer Due 11/28/2018 (Green, Shanette)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Adversary proceeding cover sheet Mon 10/29 11:39 AM
Adversary proceeding cover sheet filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner Related [+]. (Kane, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 court Clerk's correspondence Mon 10/29 11:37 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting amended cover sheet to include party type for defendant from attorney for plaintiff. Related [+] Responses due by 11/8/2018. (Dugan, S.)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-03337 Complaint by Dennis Faulkner, The Creditor Trustee against Superior Tire & Rubber Corp.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Adversary Cover Sheet). Nature(s) of suit: 12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference). filed by Plaintiff Dennis Faulkner
Friday, October 26, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/26 3:13 PM
Adversary case 18-03337 Complaint by Dennis Faulkner, The Creditor Trustee against Superior Tire & Rubber Corp.. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 Related [+]. (Kane, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet