JARKESY et al v. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Beryl A Howell |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00114 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 29, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jun 11, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 07, 2014 8:16 PM EST |
Defendant
UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GEORGE R. JARKESY, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PATRIOT28, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 12, 2014 | ||
USCA Case Number 14-5196 for23 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by PATRIOT28, LLC, GEORGE R. JARKESY, JR.. (kb) | ||
Monday, August 11, 2014 | ||
24 | 24
![]() |
|
Friday, August 08, 2014 | ||
23 | 23
![]() |
|
Wednesday, June 11, 2014 | ||
22 | 22
![]() |
|
Tuesday, June 10, 2014 | ||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
20 | 20
![]() |
|
Wednesday, March 26, 2014 | ||
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's18 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Original Complaint as CONCEDED. This Court's6 Standing Order notes that "[a] party opposing a motion for an extension of time must file, by 5:00 p.m. the day after the motion is filed, the party's reasons for opposing the motion." Standing Order, Paragraph 6(b). There being no timely opposition filed to the18 Motion for Extension of Time, "the motion shall be deemed conceded." Id. In the event the Court does not grant the plaintiffs'16 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint, the defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint within fourteen days of the Court's order on the plaintiffs'16 Motion. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 26, 2014. (lcbah1) | ||
Tuesday, March 25, 2014 | ||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 13, 2014 | ||
NOTICE OF ERROR re17 Notice of Change of Address; emailed to mbierbower@hunton.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel is reminded each attorney must use their assigned password/login | ||
Wednesday, March 12, 2014 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 11, 2014 | ||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Friday, March 07, 2014 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 04, 2014 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Monday, February 24, 2014 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Wednesday, February 19, 2014 | ||
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 2/25/2014; Response due by 3/4/2014; Reply due by 3/11/2014. (tg, ) | ||
Tuesday, February 18, 2014 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) TO SHOW CAUSE (1) why the plaintiffs' claims for injunctive relief, described in Count One of the plaintiffs'1 Complaint should not be dismissed as moot and (2) why the Court should not impose a briefing schedule solely pertaining to the plaintiffs' request for declaratory judgment described in Count Two of the plaintiffs'1 Complaint. The plaintiffs shall, by February 25, 2014, file their response to this Order. The defendant shall, by March 4, 2014, file its response, including any response to the plaintiffs' submission. The plaintiffs shall, by March 11, 2014, file any reply. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 18, 2014. (lcbah1) | ||
Tuesday, February 04, 2014 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiffs'10 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Submit Proposed Briefing Schedule. The parties shall, by February 18, 2014, submit a proposed briefing schedule to control further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 4, 2014. (lcbah1) | ||
Set/Reset Deadlines: Briefing schedule due by 2/18/2014. (tg, ) | ||
Monday, February 03, 2014 | ||
Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed briefing schedule to resolve the pending application for a preliminary and permanent injunction due by 5:00 PM on 2/4/2014. (tg, ) | ||
Friday, January 31, 2014 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beryl A. Howell: Hearing held on 1/31/2014 re3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by GEORGE R. JARKESY, and PATRIOT28, LLC. (Order forthcoming). (Court Reporter Chantal Geneus.) (tg, ) | ||
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DENYING, for the reasons stated on the record at the hearing on January 31, 2014, the plaintiffs'3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The parties are ordered to meet and confer and submit to the Court a proposed briefing schedule to resolve the pending application for a preliminary and permanent injunction, provided this matter is not moot as a result of this Order, by February 4, 2014, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 31, 2014. (lcbah1) | ||
Thursday, January 30, 2014 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition to3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, if any, due by 5:00 PM on 1/30/2014. Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order scheduled for 1/31/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Beryl A. Howell. (tg, ) | ||
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiffs'8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Mr. Stephen G. Gleboff, Esq. may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiffs in this action. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 30, 2014. (lcbah1) | ||
Wednesday, January 29, 2014 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control proceedings in this matter: the defendant shall, by January 30, 2014, at 5:00 p.m., file any opposition to the plaintiffs'3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The parties shall appear for a hearing on the plaintiffs' motion at 2:00 p.m. on January 31, 2014, in Courtroom 15. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 29, 2014. (lcbah1) | ||
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiffs'5 &7 Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Ms. Karen L. Cook, Esq. and Mr. S. Michael McColloch, Esq., may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiffs in this action. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 29, 2014. (lcbah1) |