George Jarkesy, Jr., et al v. SEC
Original Case: 1:14-cv-00114
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:14-cvus-05196 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 12, 2014 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2016 5:12 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Securities and Exchange Commission
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
George R. Jarkesy, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Patriot28, LLC
|
Represented By
|
1. | Appeals Panel Considers SEC's Use of In-House Courts (wsj.com) |
Submitted Tue 04/14/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 01/09/2016 5:12 AM EST |
Tuesday, August 12, 2014 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 14-5196 | ||
![]() |
||
![]() |