Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-42726

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kathleen H Sanberg
Case #: 4:18-ap-04171
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2018
Terminated:Jan 17, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Transilwrap Company Inc.
60 Maxwell Court
Santa Rosa, CA 95401
Plaintiff
Nauni Jo Manty, Trustee
Manty & Associates PA 401 Second Ave N Suite 400
Minneapolis, MN 55401
Represented By
Christopher A. Camardello
Manty & Associates, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
10 10 misc MNB Satisfaction of judgment Tue 09/28 4:57 PM
Satisfaction of judgment re:7 Judgment filed by Plaintiff Nauni Jo Manty, Trustee. Proof of service.(Manty, Nauni)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 18, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 01/18 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 01/18/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 01/18 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 01/18/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 17, 2019
court MNB Close adversary case Thu 01/17 12:33 PM
Adversary case 4:18-ap-4171 closed (Kathy MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
7 7 order MNB Judgment Wed 01/16 9:14 AM
Judgment for adv 4:18-ap-4171. Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
6 6 order MNB Default judgment - aplcn Wed 01/16 9:12 AM
Order Granting Application for default judgment Related [+]. Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-] 5
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Wed 01/16 9:16 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:18-ap-4171. Judgment For plaintiff. Disposition: granted. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 09, 2019
5 5 aplcn MNB Application for default judgment Wed 01/09 9:45 AM
Application for default judgment filed by Plaintiff Nauni Jo Manty, Trustee. Affidavit of default, Affidavit of identification, Affidavit on the merits, Proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law and order for judgment, Certificate of service. (Camardello, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2018
4 4 misc MNB Certificate of service Fri 11/16 9:49 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Nauni Jo Manty, Trustee.(Camardello, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Thursday, November 15, 2018
3 3 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Thu 11/15 5:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 207280. (admin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Thu 11/15 12:37 PM
Summons issued on Transilwrap Company Inc. Date Issued 11/15/2018, Answer Due 12/17/2018 (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 07, 2018
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Wed 11/07 1:40 PM
Adversary case 18-04171 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Nauni Jo Manty, Trustee against Transilwrap Company Inc.. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350 (Camardello, Christopher)
Related: [-]