Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-12635

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:18-bk-12636
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2018
Terminated:Aug 19, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
DB Holdco, Inc.
1001 Washington St
Conshohocken, PA 19428-2356
Represented By
Edmon L. Morton
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 16 seconds ago
Monday, August 19, 2019
27 27 claims Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135 Mon 08/19 10:37 AM
Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135. Filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 08/19 3:46 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
26 26 misc Post-Confirmation Report Fri 08/02 4:26 PM
Post-Confirmation Report for 2nd Quarter of 2019 Filed by DB Holdco, Inc.. (Luton Chapman, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
25 25 claims Claims Register Wed 07/10 10:30 AM
Final Claims Register Alpha and Numeric . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Numeric Claims Register
Friday, June 28, 2019
24 24 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 06/28 3:26 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service of the Final Decree and Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 and 350, Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3022, and Local Rule 3022-1 Closing Chapter 11 Case and Terminating Claims and Noticing Services (Docket No. 23), Related [+]. Filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 23 23
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
23 23 order Final Decree Wed 06/26 11:57 AM
Final Decree and Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 and 350, Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3022, and Local Rule 3022-1 Closing Chapter 11 Case and Terminating Claims and Noticing Services Order Signed on 6/26/2019. (CMB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
22 22 misc Certificate of No Objection(Aty) Tue 06/25 5:17 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtor's Motion for Final Decree and Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 and 350, Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3022, and Local Rule 3022-1 Closing Chapter 11 Case and Terminating Claims and Noticing Services Related [+] Filed by DB Holdco, Inc.. (Luton Chapman, Jaime)
Related: [-] 20
Monday, June 17, 2019
21 21 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Mon 06/17 1:08 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service of the Reorganized Debtors Motion for Final Decree and Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 and 350, Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3022, and Local Rule 3022-1 Closing Chapter 11 Case and Terminating Claims and Noticing Services (Docket No. 20), Related [+]. Filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 20 20
Thursday, June 13, 2019
20 20 motion Final Decree - Motion Thu 06/13 5:22 PM
Motion for Final Decree and Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 and 350, Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3022, and Local Rule 3022-1 Closing Chapter 11 Case and Terminating Claims and Noticing Services Filed by DB Holdco, Inc.. Objections due by 6/24/2019. (Pakrouh, Tara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
19 19 claims Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11 Tue 05/21 5:02 PM
Withdrawal of Claim #96 for CO- Douglas County Treasurer . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
18 18 claims Claims Register Tue 04/23 1:26 PM
Claims Register Alpha and Numeric . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Numeric Claims Register
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
17 17 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Tue 04/09 9:25 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Order Authorizing the Debtors to Retain and Employ Deloitte Tax LLP as Tax Services Provider Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date; and Omnibus Order Approving Final Fee Applications . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.. Related [+] (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 12 ,14
16 16 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Tue 04/09 9:23 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 9, 2019 (Hearing Cancelled) . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.. Related [+] (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, April 08, 2019
15 15 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 04/08 12:16 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by DB Holdco, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 4/9/2019 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Luton Chapman, Jaime)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order Mon 04/08 10:11 AM
Omnibus Order Approving Final Fee Applications Related [+] Order Signed on 4/8/2019. (CMB)
Related: [-] 13
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, April 05, 2019
13 13 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 04/05 4:34 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Order Approving Final Fee Applications Filed by DB Holdco, Inc.. (Luton Chapman, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
12 12 5 pgs order Order Fri 04/05 4:08 PM
Order (A) Authorizing the Debtors to Retain and Employ Deloitte Tax LLP as Tax Services Provider Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, and (B) Waiving Certain Information Requirements of Local Rule 2016-2 Related [+] Order Signed on 4/5/2019. (CMB)
Related: [-] 10
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Fri 04/05 1:24 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by DB Holdco, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 4/9/2019 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Luton Chapman, Jaime)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 04/05 11:21 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order (A) Authorizing the Debtors to Retain and Employ Deloitte Tax LLP as Tax Services Provider Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, and (B) Waiving Certain Information Requirements of Local Rule 2016-2 [D.I. 288 in Case No. 18-12635 Filed by DB Holdco, Inc.. (Luton Chapman, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, March 29, 2019
9 9 3 pgs order Order Fri 03/29 4:52 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain Cases. Order Signed on 3/29/2019. (SH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 26, 2018
8 8 claims Certification of No Claims Activity Wed 12/26 11:36 AM
Certification of No Claims Activity . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
7 7 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 11/20 3:02 PM
Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases [An order has been entered in this case directing the proceduralconsolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases ofDavids Bridal, Inc., DB Investors, Inc., DB Holdco, Inc. and DBMidco, Inc. The docket in the chapter 11 case of DavidsBridal, Inc., Case No. 18-12635 (LSS), should be consulted forall matters affecting this case. ] Signed on 11/20/2018 (CMB)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 19, 2018
6 6 crditcrd none Mon 11/19 4:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-12636 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9106340, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Mon 11/19 12:40 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Alan W. Kornberg . Receipt Number 0311-25071, Filed by Oaktree Capital Management, L.P.. (Felger, Mark)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Mon 11/19 12:32 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of John Weber . Receipt Number 0311-25071, Filed by Oaktree Capital Management, L.P.. (Felger, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Mon 11/19 12:31 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of John Weber . Receipt Number 0311-25071, Filed by Oaktree Capital Management, L.P.. (Felger, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance - Notice Mon 11/19 12:17 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Oaktree Capital Management, L.P.. (Felger, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 11/19 8:07 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by DB Holdco, Inc.. (Morton, Edmon)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 11/19 8:29 AM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case (SH)
Related: [-]