Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:18-bk-12635
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2018
Terminated:Mar 29, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Jan 04, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
David's Bridal, Inc.
1001 Washington Street
Conshohocken, PA 19428
Represented By
Tara C Pakrouh
Young Conaway
contact info
Craig A. Bruens
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
M. Natasha Labovitz
Debevoise & Plimpton
contact info
Jaime Luton Chapman
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Edmon L. Morton
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Nick S. Kaluk, III
Debovoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Daniel E Stroik
Debevoise & Plimpton
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:35 PM EST
Claims Agent
Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.
www.donlinrecano.com 6201 15th Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11219
Creditor
Central Plaza Associates, LLC
Represented By
Douglas M Evans
Kroll, Mcnamara, Evans & Delehanty, LLP
contact info
Creditor
280 Metro Limited Partnership
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Creditor
3053 RP Charleston North Rivers, LLC
Represented By
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
3133 Erie Boulevard Associates, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman Barclay Damon Tower 125 East Jefferson Street
Syracuse, NY 13202
Represented By
Teresa M Bennett
Barclay Damon LLP
contact info
Kevin M. Newman
Barclay Damon LLP
contact info
Creditor
4545 Kennedy, LLC
Represented By
Daniel C. Kerrick
Hogan Mcdaniel
contact info
Creditor
ARC CTCHRNC001, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Agree Limited Partnership
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
Amerishop Suburban, L.P.
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Creditor
Arlington ISD
500 E Border Street Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010
Represented By
Eboney Cobb
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins Mott LLP
contact info
Creditor
Belden Park Delaware, LLC
Represented By
David M. Neumann
David Neumann LLC
contact info
Creditor
Betsy & Adam Sales Inc.
Represented By
Douglas J. Pick
Pick & Zabicki,llp
contact info
Creditor
Bexar County
711 Navarro, Suite 300
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
Don Stecker
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Blondie Nites Ltd.
Represented By
Douglas J. Pick
Pick & Zabicki,llp
contact info
Creditor
Brazos County et al
P. O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Tara LeDay
Mccreary, Veselka, Bragg & Allen P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Brixmor Operating Partnership L.P.
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
David L. Pollack
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Laurel D. Roglen
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Chantelle D'nae McClamb
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Brookfield Property REIT, Inc.
Kristen N. Pate, Esq. 350 N. Orleans Street, Suite 300
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
Kristen N. Pate
Brookfield Property Reit Inc.
contact info
Creditor
CBL & Associates Management, Inc.
Represented By
Garvan F. McDaniel
Hogan Mcdaniel
contact info
Creditor
Cafaro Management Company
5577 Youngstown-Warren Road
Niles, OH 44446
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Richard T. Davis
Cafaro Management Company
contact info
Creditor
Charles County, Maryland
6801 Kenilworth Ave. Suite 400
Riverdale Park, MD 20737
Represented By
Nicole C. Kenworthy
Meyers Rodbell & Rosenbaum, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Chenal Commons DST
Represented By
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Chenal Commons LeaseCo, L.L.C.
Represented By
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
City of Fort Worth
200 Texas Street
Fort Worth, TX 76102
Represented By
Christopher B. Mosley
City Of Fort Worth
contact info
Creditor
City of McAllen
Represented By
Diane W. Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
City of Waco et al
P.O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Tara LeDay
Mccreary, Veselka, Bragg & Allen P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Clear Creek Independent School District, et al
Perdue, Brandon, Fiedler, Collins & Mott c/o Owen M. Sonik 1235 North Loop West Suite 600
Houston, TX 77008
Represented By
Owen M. Sonik
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
ColFin 2015-3 Ind Owner, LLC
Represented By
Michelle E. Shriro
Singer & Levick, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Comenity Bank
Represented By
Jason A. Gibson
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Frederick Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Matthew Schaeffer
Bailey Cavalieri LLC
contact info
Scott J. Leonhardt
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Robert B. Berner
Bailey Cavalieri LLC
contact info
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Revenue
Bureau of Compliance Department 280946
Harrisburg, PA 17128
Represented By
Christopher R. Momjian
Pa Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
Crowley ISD
500 East Border Street, Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010
Represented By
Eboney Cobb
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins Mott LLP
contact info
Creditor
Cumberland Avenue Plaza, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman Barclay Damon Tower 125 East Jefferson Street
Syracuse, NY 13202
Represented By
Teresa M Bennett
Barclay Damon LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Kevin M. Newman
Barclay Damon LLP
contact info
Creditor
Cypress-Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP C/O John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
c/o Elizabeth Weller Dallas County, Tarrant County
Libarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP 2777 N Stemmons Frwy, #1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Dayleen Intimates, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph H Lemkin
Stark & Stark
contact info
Creditor
Denton County
P. O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Tara LeDay
Mccreary, Veselka, Bragg & Allen P.C.
contact info
Creditor
ESCONDIDO MISSION VILLAGE
Represented By
Gerald P. Kennedy
Procopio Cory Hargreaves & Savitch LLP
contact info
Creditor
FAIRVIEW HEIGHTS IMPROVEMENTS, LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
FTT Village Fair North, LLC
Represented By
Ryan Bird
Gilbert Bird Law Firm, PC
contact info
Creditor
Falls Plaza, LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
Federal Realty Investment Trust
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
David L. Pollack
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Laurel D. Roglen
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Chantelle D'nae McClamb
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Fort Bend County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
GPH Davenport Retail, LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
Gateway Pinole Vista, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Goldenberg Group
Kurtzman | Steady, LLC 401 S. 2nd Street, Suite 200
Philadelphia, PA 19147
Represented By
Jeffrey Kurtzman
Kurtzman | Steady, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Hidalgo County
Represented By
Diane W. Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Hines Global REIT 2615 Med Center Parkway, LLC
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Creditor
IREIT Layton Pointe, L.L.C.
Represented By
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
JH Davenport Retail, LLC
Represented By
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
KIR Maple Grove L.P.
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Creditor
KIR Tukwila, L.P.
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Creditor
KRS Davenport Retail, LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
Levin Management Corporation
Represented By
Thomas Onder
C/o Stark & Stark, P.C.
contact info
Joseph H Lemkin
Stark & Stark
contact info
John R. Weaver, Jr.
contact info
Creditor
Lokre Preferred 1, LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
Lubbock Central Appraisal District
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott PO Box 817
Lubbock, TX 79408
Represented By
Laura J. Monroe
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins Mott LLP
contact info
Creditor
MCS Davenport Retail, LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
ME Davenport Retail, LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
MM Davenport Retail, LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
Madison Waldorf LLC
Represented By
Matthew O Talmo
Morris, Nichols Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Creditor
Maricopa County Treasurer's Office
Maricopa County Attorney's Office c/o Peter Muthig 222 North Central Avenue, Suite 1100
Phoenix, AZ 85004
Represented By
Peter Klaus Muthig
Maricopa County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
McLennan County
Represented By
Diane W. Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Memorial Square DST
Represented By
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Memorial Square LeaseCo, L.L.C.
Represented By
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105
Represented By
Steven A. Ginther
Missouri Dept. Of Revenue
contact info
Creditor
Nueces County
Represented By
Diane W. Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Oaktree Capital Management, L.P., Courage Capital Management, LLC, AlbaCore Capital LLP, Deutsche Bank AG Cayman Islands Branch
Represented By
Mark E. Felger
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Alan W. Kornberg
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Thomas G. Macauley
Macauley LLC
contact info
John Weber
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton Garrison LLP
contact info
Creditor
Otay Main Street, LLC
Represented By
Victor W. Newmark
Wiles And Wiles
contact info
Creditor
PGIM Real Estate
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
PREIT Services, LLC, as agent for PR North Dartmouth, LLC and PR Wyoming Valley Limited Partnership
Kurtzman | Steady, LLC 401 S. 2nd Street, Suite 200
Philadelphia, PA 19147
Represented By
Jeffrey Kurtzman
Kurtzman | Steady, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Philips International Holding Corp.
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Susan E. Kaufman
Law Office Of Susan E. Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Prince George's County, Maryland
6801 Kenilworth Ave. Suite 400
Riverdale Park, MD 20737
Represented By
Nicole C. Kenworthy
Meyers Rodbell & Rosenbaum, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
RPAI San Antonio Limited Partnership
Represented By
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ramco West Oaks II LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
Richard V. Santangelo and Marti M. Santangelo Living Trust
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
Richardson ISD
500 E Border Street Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010
Represented By
Eboney Cobb
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins Mott LLP
contact info
Creditor
Rita P. Tucker Irrevocable Trust Agreement U/A dated December 5, 2006
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
SITE Centers Corp.
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Susan E. Kaufman
Law Office Of Susan E. Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Creditor
SPRING CREEK IMPROVEMENTS, LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
Deb Secrest
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Labor and Industry 651 Boas Street, Room 702
Harrisburg, PA 17121
Creditor
Simon Property Group, L.P.
225 West Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Ronald Mark Tucker
Simon Property Group, Inc.
contact info
Creditor
Snap, Inc.
Represented By
Edward H. Tillinghast, III
Sheppard Mullin
contact info
Creditor
South Denver Marketplace
Represented By
Steven W. Kelly
S&d Law
contact info
Creditor
Starwood Retail Partners, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Taylor County CAD
P. O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Tara LeDay
Mccreary, Veselka, Bragg & Allen P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
John Stern Assistant Attorney General P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711
Represented By
John Mark Stern
Office Of The Attorney General Of Texas
contact info
Creditor
The Macerich Company
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Travis County
P.O. Box 1748
Austin, TX 78767
Represented By
Kay Diebel Brock
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Urstadt Biddle Properties Inc.
Represented By
Douglas M Evans
Kroll, Mcnamara, Evans & Delehanty, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Villa View, LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
Washington Prime Group Inc.
3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202
Represented By
Susan E. Kaufman
Law Office Of Susan E. Kaufman, LLC
contact info
A.J. Webb
Frost Brown Todd LLC
contact info
Ronald E Gold
Frost Brown Todd LLC
contact info
Creditor
Weingarten Nostat, Inc.
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Weingarten Realty Investors
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Weingarten/Miller/Aurora II LLC and GDC Aurora, LLC
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
West Matthew Drive, LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
Wilmington Trust National Association
Represented By
Jordana L Renert
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Andrew I. Silfen
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Creditor
Wilmington Trust, National Association
Represented By
Andrew I. Silfen
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Creditor
Xscape Evenings Ltd
Represented By
Douglas J. Pick
Pick & Zabicki,llp
contact info
Creditor
salesforce.com, inc.
Bialson, Bergen & Schwab c/o Lawrence Schwab/Thomas Gaa 633 Menlo Ave., Suite 100
Menlo Park, CA 94025
Represented By
Thomas M. Gaa
Bialson Bergen & Schwab
contact info
Lawrence M. Schwab
Bialson Bergen & Schwab
contact info
Interested Party
ARC SSSDLLA001,LLC
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Term Lender Group
Represented By
Laura Davis Jones
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Timothy P. Cairns
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Joseph Michael Mulvihill
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Michael J. Cohen
Jones Day
contact info
Nicholas J. Morin
Jones Day
contact info
Scott J. Greenberg
Jones Day
contact info
Interested Party
Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent (Term Loan Agent)
Represented By
Kathleen M. LaManna
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
contact info
Laura Davis Jones
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Bank of America, N.A., as Prepetition Term Loan Agent
Represented By
Joel H Levitin
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Loren D. Goodman
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Richard A. Stieglitz Jr.
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Bank of America, N.A., as administrative agent and collateral agent
Represented By
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Julia Frost-Davies
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Christopher L. Carter
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Brett Michael Haywood
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Glenn E Siegel
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Brixmor Operating Partnership LP
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Brixton Pavilion, LLC, a Delaware limited liability Company
Represented By
Ernie Zachary Park
contact info
Interested Party
Brookfield Properties Retail Group
Represented By
Susan E. Kaufman
Law Office Of Susan E. Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Centerpoint Development Company L.L.C.
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Clayton, Dubilier & Rice LLC
Represented By
Norman L. Pernick
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
David M. Bass
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
J. Kate Stickles
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Comenity Capital Bank
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Hines Real Estate Investment Trust, Inc.
Represented By
Susan E. Kaufman
Law Office Of Susan E. Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Jenny Yoo Collection, Inc.
Represented By
Brett D. Fallon
Morris James LLP
contact info
Interested Party
David L. Laurinaitis
Interested Party
MANANA-DCIT, LLC
Represented By
Ivan M. Gold
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory Natsis
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Laurel D. Roglen
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Interested Party
MT San Antonio I, LLC
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Manana-DCIT, LLC
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Office of Unemployment Compensation Tax Services
Interested Party
Ernie Zachary Park
Bewley, Lassleben & Miller, LLP 13215 E. Penn Street Suite 510
Whittier, CA 90602
Interested Party
R46 Realty Associates, L.P.
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Laurel D. Roglen
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Interested Party
SVF University Westwood, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey S Kwong
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P
contact info
Eve Helen Karasik
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P
contact info
Interested Party
Term Loan Agent
Represented By
Kathleen M. LaManna
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
contact info
Laura Davis Jones
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Joseph M Mulvihill
C/o Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Timothy P. Cairns
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Michael J. Cohen
Jones Day
contact info
Nicholas J. Morin
Jones Day
contact info
Scott J. Greenberg
Jones Day
contact info
Interested Party
Weitzman
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Interested Party
salesforce.com, Inc.
Represented By
Ricardo Palacio, Esq
Ashby & Geddes, P. A.
contact info
Other Prof.
Evercore Group L.L.C.
Represented By
Richard A. Chesley
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Maris J. Kandestin
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Jamila Justine Willis
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable
1007 North Orange St
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Timothy Jay Fox, Jr.
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 38 seconds ago
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
334 334 2 pgs claims Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11 Wed 11/13 4:08 PM
Withdrawal of Claim No. 76 Secured Claim Filed December 27, 2018 . Filed by The City of Portage. (NAB)
Related: [-]