Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-12635

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:18-bk-12637
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2018
Terminated:Mar 29, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
DB Midco, Inc.
1001 Washington St
Conshohocken, PA 19428-2356
Represented By
Edmon L. Morton
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
9 9 claims Claims Register Wed 07/10 10:31 AM
Final Claims Register Alpha and Numeric . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Numeric Claims Register
Friday, March 29, 2019
8 8 3 pgs order Order Fri 03/29 3:47 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain Cases - Order Signed on 3/29/2019. (LJJ)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 03/29 4:48 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 26, 2018
7 7 claims Certification of No Claims Activity Wed 12/26 11:37 AM
Certification of No Claims Activity . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
6 6 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 11/20 3:02 PM
Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases [An order has been entered in this case directing the proceduralconsolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases ofDavids Bridal, Inc., DB Investors, Inc., DB Holdco, Inc. and DBMidco, Inc. The docket in the chapter 11 case of DavidsBridal, Inc., Case No. 18-12635 (LSS), should be consulted forall matters affecting this case. ] Signed on 11/20/2018 (CMB)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 19, 2018
5 5 crditcrd none Mon 11/19 4:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-12637 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9106340, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Mon 11/19 12:41 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Alan W. Kornberg . Receipt Number 0311-25071, Filed by Oaktree Capital Management, L.P.. (Felger, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Mon 11/19 12:34 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of John Weber . Receipt Number 0311-25071, Filed by Oaktree Capital Management, L.P.. (Felger, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance - Notice Mon 11/19 12:19 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Oaktree Capital Management, L.P.. (Felger, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 11/19 8:10 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by DB Midco, Inc.. (Morton, Edmon)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 11/19 8:29 AM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case (SH)
Related: [-]