Sherman v. Niven
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-30845
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-30845
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Harlin Dewayne Hale |
Case #: | 3:18-ap-03355 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Norry Niven
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel J. Sherman
Sherman & Yaquinto 509 N. Montclair Ave.
Dallas, TX 75208 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Thursday, October 10, 2019 | ||
court
Close adversary case
Thu 10/10 8:22 AM
Adversary case 3:18-ap-3355 closed (Ecker, C.) |
||
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document
Fri 09/27 11:30 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/27/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Dismiss case
Wed 09/25 2:33 PM
Order of dismissal after settlement agreement in related bankruptcy case. Entered on 9/25/2019 (Blanco, J.) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
court
Clerk's correspondence
Mon 07/29 8:17 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting Case Status from attorney for plaintiff. Responses due by 8/5/2019. (Ecker, C.) |
|
Saturday, March 30, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document
Sat 03/30 11:34 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/30/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
order
Dismiss adversary proceeding
Thu 03/28 5:04 PM
Order granting in part, denying in part motion to dismiss adversary proceeding Entered on 3/28/2019. (Whitaker, Sheniqua) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
court
Hearing held
Mon 03/25 4:46 PM
Hearing held on 3/25/2019. (NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER SIDE; TRUSTEE WAS PRESENT IN ANOTHER MATTER; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TO CONFER WITH COURTROOM DEPUTY.) (Green, Shanette) |
||
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended complaint
Tue 03/19 3:53 PM
Amended complaint by Aaron Michael Kaufman on behalf of Daniel J. Sherman against Norry Niven Removing nature(s) of suit. . (Kaufman, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Redline Comparison to Original Complaint | ||
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
court
Hearing held
Tue 03/05 12:46 PM
Hearing held on 3/5/2019. (FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW READ INTO THE RECORD; GRANTED IN PART; MR. KATHMAN TO UPLOAD ORDER; TRUSTEE SHALL HAVE 14 DAYS TO REPLEAD.) (Green, Shanette) |
||
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of hearing
Fri 03/01 4:37 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendant Norry Niven . Hearing to be held on 3/5/2019 at 11:00 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for5 , (Kathman, Jason) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Support/supplemental document
Fri 02/22 11:07 AM
Support/supplemental document Norry Niven's Letter Brief in Opposition of Dismissal Under 11 U.S.C. § 707(a) filed by Defendant Norry Niven . (Kathman, Jason) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Brief
Fri 02/22 10:11 AM
Brief in opposition filed by Plaintiff Daniel J. Sherman . (Kaufman, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (generic)
Thu 02/21 5:09 PM
INCORRECT ENTRY: WRONG EVENT CODE USED. ATTY TO REFILE. Notice of Defendant, Norry Niven's, Letter Brief in Opposition of Dismissal Under 11 U.S.C. § 707(a) filed by Defendant Norry Niven. (Kathman, Jason) MODIFIED on 2/22/2019 (Whitaker, Sherri) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice (generic)
Thu 02/21 4:32 PM
INCORRECT ENTRY: WRONG EVENT CODE USED. SEE #14 otice of Trustee's Brief in Opposition of Dismissal Under 11 USC 707(a) filed by Plaintiff Daniel J. Sherman . (Kaufman, Aaron) MODIFIED on 2/22/2019 (Whitaker, Sherri) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
court
Hearing held
Mon 02/11 4:20 PM
Hearing held on 2/11/2019. (MATTER TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; COURT WILL RULE VIA COURT CALL IN A FEW DAYS.) (Green, Shanette) |
||
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Withdrawal
Tue 02/05 9:22 AM
Withdrawal of Docket No. 9 filed by Defendant Norry Niven . (Kathman, Jason) |
|
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Reply
Fri 02/01 6:11 PM
Reply to filed by Defendant Norry Niven. (Kathman, Jason) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Reply
Fri 02/01 3:49 PM
Reply to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Norry Niven. (Kathman, Jason) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Objection
Mon 01/14 4:42 PM
Objection to and Related Brief filed by Plaintiff Daniel J. Sherman. (Kaufman, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of hearing
Thu 01/10 1:00 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendant Norry Niven . Hearing to be held on 2/11/2019 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for5 , (Kathman, Jason) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Brief
Fri 01/04 6:52 PM
Brief in support filed by Defendant Norry Niven . (Kathman, Jason) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss adversary proceeding
Fri 01/04 6:48 PM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Norry Niven (Kathman, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons service executed
Tue 11/27 4:55 PM
Summons service executed on Norry Niven 11/20/2018 (Kaufman, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
order
Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding
Tue 11/20 10:27 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call . Trial Docket Call date set for 3/25/2019 at 10:30 AM at Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm. Trial week 4/1/2019. Entered on 11/20/2018 (Bergreen, J.) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons issued
Tue 11/20 10:25 AM
Summons issued on Norry Niven Answer Due 12/20/2018 (Bergreen, J.) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/19 11:51 AM
Adversary case 18-03355 Complaint by Daniel J. Sherman against Norry Niven. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 14 . 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (Kaufman, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet |