Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-09308

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Carol A Doyle
Case #: 1:18-ap-00913
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2018
Terminated:Mar 06, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Property Holdings LLC
Represented By
Property Holdings LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 Trustee for MACK INDUSTRIES II, LLC and MACK INDUSTRIES III, LLC
Jenner & Block LLP 353 N. Clark St.
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
Ronald Peterson
Jenner & Block
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
19 19 court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/06 7:46 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-913 Closed . (Seamann, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
18 18 court Hearing Stricken (Other) Tue 03/05 12:07 PM
Hearing Scheduled for March 7, 2019 is Stricken Related [+]. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, March 01, 2019
17 17 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/01 2:44 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Ronald Peterson on behalf of Ronald R. Peterson. (Peterson, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
16 16 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 02/27 3:14 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 03/07/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 02/27/2019. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/06 12:07 PM
Amended Complaint by Ronald Peterson on behalf of Ronald R. Peterson against Property Holdings LLC. Related [+]. (Peterson, Ronald)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Thursday, January 24, 2019
14 14 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 01/24 12:27 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 02/27/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 01/24/2019. (McGee, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
13 13 order Scheduling Thu 01/24 8:18 AM
Order Scheduling Related [+]. Answer due by: 2/20/2019. Amended Complaint Deadline 2/6/2019. Signed on 1/23/2019 (Pruitt, Debra)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
12 12 order Default Judgment Wed 01/23 2:34 PM
(E)Order Denying for the Reasons Stated on the Record Motion For Default Judgment Related [+]. Signed on 01/23/2019. (McGee, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 6
11 11 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/23 10:53 AM
(E)Order Granting Motion for Leave To Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. Signed on 1/23/2019. (Galimba, April)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, January 22, 2019
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/23 10:50 AM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Andrew Kamensky on behalf of Property Holdings LLC . (Galimba, April)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Objection Tue 01/22 2:33 PM
Objection to Related [+] Filed by Matthew C Abad on behalf of Property Holdings LLC (Abad, Matthew)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Judgment
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
8 8 misc Appearance Tue 01/22 12:19 PM
Appearance for Blake A. Strautins Filed by Matthew C Abad on behalf of Property Holdings LLC. (Abad, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Appearance Tue 01/22 12:17 PM
Appearance for David C. Kluever Filed by Matthew C Abad on behalf of Property Holdings LLC. (Abad, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 09, 2019
6 6 motion Default Judgment Wed 01/09 2:13 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Ronald Peterson on behalf of Ronald R. Peterson. Hearing scheduled for 1/23/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Peterson, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Proposed Order - Motion for Entry of Default Judgment
Att: 4 Default Judgment in Adversary Proceeding
5 5 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 01/09 11:24 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 01/24/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 01/09/2019. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
4 4 utility U - Corrective Entry Tue 11/20 4:10 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: to attach correct PDF Related [+]. (Sirmons, Dornesa)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, November 19, 2018
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 11/19 1:46 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-00913 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 38533670. Fee Amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 11/19 1:34 PM
Summons Issued on Property Holdings LLC Answer Due 12/19/2018 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/19 1:34 PM
Adversary case 18-00913 (91 (Declaratory judgment)): Complaint by Ronald R. Peterson against Property Holdings LLC. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 1/9/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Peterson, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D