Vanguard Health & Wellness LLC v. Filek et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-04707
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-04707
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jacqueline P Cox |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-00929 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Tatyana Filek
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aleksandra Dubovik
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanguard Health & Wellness LLC
1585 Ellingwood Avenue, Suite 100
Des Plaines, IL 60016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:06 PM CDT |
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 02/07 4:02 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-929 Closed . (Rivera, Melissa) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Judgment on the Pleadings
Wed 12/19 1:31 PM
Order Granting Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings - The 1/10/2019 status hearing is stricken . Signed on 12/18/2018. (Green, Ron) |
|
9 | 9
court
Hearing Stricken (Other)
Tue 12/18 5:07 PM
Hearing Scheduled for 01/10/2019 is Stricken . (Green, Josephine) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Thu 12/13 5:39 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by Ariel Weissberg on behalf of Aleksandra Dubovik, Tatyana Filek. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2018 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Weissberg, Ariel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 12/13 4:32 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Ariel Weissberg on behalf of Aleksandra Dubovik, Tatyana Filek. (Weissberg, Ariel) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 12/11 9:53 PM
Summons Service Executed on Aleksandra Dubovik, Tatyana Filek . (Wu, Xiaoming) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Appearance
Tue 12/11 5:50 PM
Appearance for Lindsey Purdy Filed by Ariel Weissberg on behalf of Aleksandra Dubovik, Tatyana Filek. (Weissberg, Ariel) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Appearance
Tue 12/11 5:49 PM
Appearance Filed by Ariel Weissberg on behalf of Aleksandra Dubovik, Tatyana Filek. (Weissberg, Ariel) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040)
Tue 12/04 10:20 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Xiaoming Wu on behalf of Vanguard Health & Wellness LLC . (Wu, Xiaoming) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Tue 12/04 10:05 PM
Summons Issued on Tatyana Filek Answer Due 01/3/2019; Aleksandra Dubovik Answer Due 01/3/2019 (Admin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/04 10:05 PM
Adversary case 18-00929 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)): Complaint by Vanguard Health & Wellness LLC against Tatyana Filek, Aleksandra Dubovik. (Fee Not Required). Status hearing to be held on 1/10/2019 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Wu, Xiaoming) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |