New Mexico Health Connections v. HHS, et al
Original Case: 1:16-cv-00878
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-02186 |
Type | civil / usa as party |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Dec 17, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 31, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 02, 2020 1:23 AM MST |
Amicus Curiae
BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
AMERICA'S HEALTH INSURANCE PLANS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
ALEX M. AZAR, II, Secretary of the United States Departyment of Health and Human Services, in his official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
SEEMA VERMA, Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, in her official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
NEW MEXICO HEALTH CONNECTIONS, a New Mexico mon-profit corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/02/2020 1:23 AM MST |
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
[10612933] Entry of appearance submitted by Alisa B. Klein for Appellants Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, HHS and Ms. Seema Verma for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/17/2018. Manner of Service: email. 18-2186 [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 12/18/2018 by NA] ABK | ||
[10612927] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/17/2018 Docketing statement and transcript order form due 01/02/2019 for Alex M. Azar II, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health & Human Services and Seema Verma. Notice of appearance due on 01/02/2019 for Alex M. Azar II, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, New Mexico Health Connections, United States Department of Health & Human Services and Seema Verma. 18-2186 | ||
Att: 1 215 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |