Gold v. CV Management, Inc.,
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10102
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10102
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Klinette H Kindred |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01132 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 17, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
CV Management, Inc.,
1972 Boxwood Drive
Newtown, PA 18940 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
H. Jason Gold
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP 101 Constitution Avenue NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
41 | 41
court
Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled
Tue 01/05 10:30 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled: Complaint Dismissed and Closed. (Williams, Regina) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2020 | ||
40 | 40
court
Adversary Proceeding Closed
Thu 12/17 1:28 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Jones, Angela) |
|
Wednesday, December 16, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Wed 12/16 5:55 PM
Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Alexander McDonald Laughlin of Odin Feldman & Pittleman, P.C. on behalf of H. Jason Gold. (Laughlin, Alexander) |
|
Sunday, June 21, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Mon 06/22 12:16 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
order
Amended Order
Fri 06/19 1:57 PM
Corrected Order Granting Motion To Establish Discovery Plan And Scheduling Order Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Jones, Angela) |
|
Tuesday, June 16, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
court
Hearing Cancelled
Tue 06/16 10:38 AM
Hearing Cancelle: Order Entered. (williamsr) |
|
Saturday, June 13, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Sun 06/14 12:19 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, June 11, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
order
Directing
Thu 06/11 12:38 PM
Order Granting Motion To Establish Discovery Plan And Scheduling Order Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Jones, Angela) |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 06/03 4:34 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motion to Establish Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order filed by Alexander McDonald Laughlin of Odin Feldman & Pittleman, P.C. on behalf of H. Jason Gold. Hearing scheduled for 6/16/2020 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Laughlin, Alexander) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Discovery Plan
Wed 06/03 4:30 PM
Joint Discovery Plan with Notice of Hearing, Motion to Establish Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order filed by Alexander McDonald Laughlin of Odin Feldman & Pittleman, P.C. on behalf of H. Jason Gold. Hearing scheduled for 6/16/2020 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA.(Laughlin, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Tue 05/26 12:44 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Kristen S. Eustis filed by Kristen S. Eustis of Miles & Stockbridge P.C. on behalf of CV Management, Inc.,. (Eustis, Kristen) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
answer
None
Fri 01/17 11:59 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by John T. Farnum of Miles and Stockbridge PC on behalf of CV Management, Inc.,. (Farnum, John) |
|
Sunday, December 22, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Mon 12/23 12:26 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding
Fri 12/20 12:24 PM
Stipulation And Consent Order Granting Motions to Reopen Adversary Proceedings And To Vacate And Reconsider Entry Of Judgments By Default (Jones, Angela) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
court
Hearing held; motion settled.
Tue 12/17 11:13 AM
Hearing held; motion settled. Appearances: John T. Farnum, Alexander McDonald Laughlin Order/Disposition due by 12/31/2019. (williamsr) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Scheduling Trial
Tue 10/22 9:00 AM
Scheduling Order;Trial set for 12/17/2019 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Jones, Angela) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
court
Hearing continued
Tue 10/15 1:14 PM
Hearing continued; Appearances: John T. Farnum, Alexander McDonald Laughlin Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 at 01:00 PM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (williamsr) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
court
Hearing continued
Tue 09/24 3:05 PM
Hearing continued; Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (chandlerkj) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
answer
Objection
Tue 09/17 6:04 PM
Objection to Trustee's Opposition to Motion to Re-Open Adversary Proceeding and to Vacate and Reconsider Entry of Judgment by Default filed by Alexander McDonald Laughlin of Odin Feldman & Pittleman, P.C. on behalf of H. Jason Gold. (Laughlin, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 08/26 3:17 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by Kristen S. Eustis of Miles & Stockbridge P.C. on behalf of CV Management, Inc.,. Hearing scheduled for 9/24/2019 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Eustis, Kristen) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Reopen Adversary Proceeding
Mon 08/26 3:09 PM
Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding and to Vacate and Reconsider Entry of Judgment by Default filed by John T. Farnum of Miles and Stockbridge PC on behalf of CV Management, Inc.,. (Farnum, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
court
Adversary Proceeding Closed
Thu 07/11 12:10 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Jones, Angela) |
|
Sunday, June 09, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Mon 06/10 12:20 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
court
Entry Modification Made: See entry
Fri 06/07 2:52 PM
Entry Modification Made Entered in Error: See entry #17 for the correct order, entered on docket date. (Swinton, Rachel) |
|
17 | 17
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 06/07 2:41 PM
Corrected Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment Against CV Management, Inc. (to include correct entered on docket date) (Jones, Angela) |
|
16 | 16
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 06/07 10:31 AM
Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment Against CV Management, Inc. (Jones, Angela) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
court
Hearing held; motion granted
Tue 06/04 3:47 PM
Hearing held; motion granted;Order To Be Submitte Appearance: Alexander McDonald Laughlin Order/Disposition due by 06/18/2019. (chandlerkj) |
|
14 | 14
court
Hearing held
Tue 06/04 3:46 PM
Hearing held;MOOT Appearance: Alexander McDonald Laughlin (chandlerkj) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 05/17 5:17 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motion for Default Judgment filed by Alexander McDonald Laughlin of Odin Feldman & Pittleman, P.C. on behalf of H. Jason Gold. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2019 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Laughlin, Alexander) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 05/17 5:15 PM
Motion for Default Judgment filed by Alexander McDonald Laughlin of Odin Feldman & Pittleman, P.C. on behalf of H. Jason Gold. (Laughlin, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Sunday, February 24, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC certificate of mailing
Mon 02/25 12:22 AM
BNC certificate of mailing (Admin.) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
court
Entry of Default
Fri 02/22 9:01 AM
Entry of Default against CV Management, Inc., (Jones, Angela) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Entry of Default
Thu 02/14 2:42 PM
Motion for Entry of Default against Defendant, CV Management, Inc., by Clerk of Court filed by Alexander McDonald Laughlin of Odin Feldman & Pittleman, P.C. on behalf of H. Jason Gold. (Laughlin, Alexander) |
|
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/10 3:41 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Service filed by Alexander McDonald Laughlin of Odin Feldman & Pittleman, P.C. on behalf of H. Jason Gold. (Laughlin, Alexander) |
|
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Wed 01/09 1:19 PM
Alias Initial Scheduling Order (Jones, Angela) |
|
6 | 6
court
Alias Summons issued
Wed 01/09 1:07 PM
Alias Summons issued Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA, (Jones, Angela) |
|
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Request for Alias Summons
Tue 01/08 12:29 PM
Request for Alias Summons filed by Alexander McDonald Laughlin of Odin Feldman & Pittleman, P.C. on behalf of H. Jason Gold. (Laughlin, Alexander) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Wed 12/19 3:33 PM
Initial Scheduling Order (Jones, Angela) |
|
3 | 3
summon
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 12/19 3:31 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to CV Management, Inc., Answer Due 1/18/2019 Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA, (Jones, Angela) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 12/18 3:29 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 18-01132 KHK) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 29605660, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 12/18 3:28 PM
Adversary case 18-01132 Complaint against CV Management, Inc., filed by H. Jason Gold. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 1:17-bk-10102 (Laughlin, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A-C |