Dunn v. Arabian Horse Association of Arizona et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-26856
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-26856
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01501 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Arabian Horse Association of Arizona
4524 W Port Au Prince Ln.
Glendale, AZ 85306 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arabian Horse Association of Florida, Inc.
620 SW Bittern St.
Palm City, FL 34990 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arabian Horse Association
10805 E Bethany Dr.
Aurora, CO 80014 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcia Dunn
555 NE 15 Street Suite 934-A
Miami, FL 33132 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)
Fri 07/21 7:45 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by SS. Receipt Number 322140. (admin) |
||
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 08/09 12:40 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1501 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Dismissal [Adversary]
Tue 06/18 11:51 AM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 03/11 5:41 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Continue Hearing Order
Mon 03/04 10:15 AM
Order Granting Agreed Ex Parte Motion To Continue Pre-Trial Conference On: (1 Complaint). Pretrial Conference set for 08/07/2019 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Barr, Ida) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Continue Hearing
Fri 03/01 3:24 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn (Kligler, Joshua) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (Barr, Ida) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Initial Disclosure (Rule 26)
Wed 02/13 9:17 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements (Expert Witnesses) Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Initial Disclosure (Rule 26)
Wed 02/06 3:20 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 01/04 2:36 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 01/04 2:35 PM
Summons Service Executed on Arabian Horse Association 1/4/2019; Arabian Horse Association of Arizona 1/4/2019; Arabian Horse Association of Florida, Inc. 1/4/2019 Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn, Defendants Arabian Horse Association, Arabian Horse Association of Arizona, Arabian Horse Association of Florida, Inc.. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 12/29 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 12/28/2018. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 12/29 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 12/28/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 26, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Wed 12/26 6:28 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Michael P Dunn Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Dunn, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order Setting Requirements (Adv)
Wed 12/26 3:52 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Rodriguez, Olga) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Wed 12/26 3:50 PM
Summons Issued on Arabian Horse Association Answer Due 1/25/2019; Arabian Horse Association of Arizona Answer Due 1/25/2019; Arabian Horse Association of Florida, Inc. Answer Due 1/25/2019 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pretrial Conference set for 03/06/2019 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Rodriguez, Olga) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit to Defer Filing Fee (Complaint) [Trustee]
Wed 12/26 11:55 AM
Trustee's Affidavit to Defer Complaint Filing Fee. Filed by Plaintiff Marcia Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/21 4:51 PM
Adversary case 18-01501 Complaint by Marcia Dunn against Arabian Horse Association of Arizona, Arabian Horse Association of Florida, Inc., Arabian Horse Association. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" |