Dunn v. Ditech Financial LLC, as Successor to Green Tree S
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-26856
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-26856
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01504 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 15, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Ditech Financial LLC, as Successor to Green Tree Servicing LLC
1200 South Pine Island Rd.
Plantation, FL 33324 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcia T Dunn
66 West Flagler Street
Miami, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)
Fri 07/21 7:45 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by SS. Receipt Number 322143. (admin) |
||
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 01/15 10:00 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1504 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Dismissal [Adversary]
Fri 11/01 11:45 AM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (Voluntary). Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
court
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Tue 06/04 11:27 AM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Hearing ***PROCEEDING ABATED*** (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 05/21 9:46 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Thu 05/16 12:07 PM
Order Abating Adversary Proceeding . (Barr, Ida) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK
Thu 05/16 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Date 05/15/2019. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/15 10:24 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Saturday, May 11, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
court
Notice of Hearing (AP)
Sat 05/11 7:43 PM
Notice of Status Conference scheduled for 07/25/2019 at 09:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK
Thu 03/14 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Date 03/13/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 03/12 12:35 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
Notice of Hearing (AP)
Mon 03/11 11:49 AM
Notice of Status Conference scheduled for 05/08/2019 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 02/27 10:06 AM
Notice of Filing and Imposition of Automatic Stay , Filed by Defendant Ditech Financial LLC, as Successor to Green Tree Servicing LLC.(Samsing, Erik) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Initial Disclosure (Rule 26)
Wed 02/13 9:22 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements (Expert Witnesses) Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Initial Disclosure (Rule 26)
Wed 02/06 3:22 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 01/04 3:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 01/04 3:36 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ditech Financial LLC, as Successor to Green Tree Servicing LLC 1/4/2019 Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn, Defendant Ditech Financial LLC, as Successor to Green Tree Servicing LLC. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, December 26, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Wed 12/26 6:48 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Michael P Dunn Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Dunn, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order Setting Requirements (Adv)
Wed 12/26 4:06 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Rodriguez, Olga) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Wed 12/26 4:06 PM
Summons Issued on Ditech Financial LLC, as Successor to Green Tree Servicing LLC Answer Due 1/25/2019 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pretrial Conference set for 03/06/2019 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Rodriguez, Olga) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit to Defer Filing Fee (Complaint) [Trustee]
Wed 12/26 11:57 AM
Trustee's Affidavit to Defer Complaint Filing Fee. Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/21 5:44 PM
Adversary case 18-01504 Complaint by Marcia T Dunn against Ditech Financial LLC, as Successor to Green Tree Servicing LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Transfers |