Dunn v. Bank of America, N.A.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-26856
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-26856
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01506 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 12, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
1200 South Pine Island Rd.
Plantation, FL 33324 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcia T Dunn
66 West Flagler Street
Miami, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)
Fri 07/21 7:45 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by SS. Receipt Number 322145. (admin) |
||
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 09/12 9:25 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1506 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Dismissal [Adversary]
Thu 09/05 9:13 AM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (Voluntary). Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
court
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Mon 07/29 8:38 AM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Hearing - 9019 Motion Filed (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 05/29 1:51 PM
Notice of Filing Trustees Motion to Compromise Controversy with Bank of America, N.A. , Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 03/08 2:26 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Continue Hearing Order
Fri 03/01 10:30 AM
Order Granting Agreed Ex Parte Motion To Continue Pretrial Conference And Trial On: (1 Complaint). Pretrial Conference set for 08/07/2019 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Barr, Ida) Modified text on 3/1/2019 (Barr, Ida) |
|
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Continue Hearing
Thu 02/28 4:38 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 02/26 4:08 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Luna, Laudy) |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Initial Disclosure (Rule 26)
Wed 02/13 9:23 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements (Expert Witnesses) Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Initial Disclosure (Rule 26)
Wed 02/06 6:24 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Luna, Laudy) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Initial Disclosure (Rule 26)
Wed 02/06 3:27 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
attydoc
Notice of Unavailability [Attorney]
Tue 02/05 11:41 AM
Notice of Unavailability from February 15 -18, 2019 to March 21-27, 2019 by Attorney Laudy Luna Esq.. (Luna, Laudy) |
|
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Extend Time Order
Fri 02/01 1:22 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint . |
|
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extend Time
Fri 01/25 5:15 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to February 26, 2019 Filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Luna, Laudy) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 01/04 4:11 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 01/04 4:07 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bank of America, N.A. 1/4/2019 Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn, Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Fri 12/28 5:23 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Michael P Dunn Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Dunn, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, December 26, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order Setting Requirements (Adv)
Wed 12/26 3:02 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Catala, Nilda) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Wed 12/26 3:00 PM
Summons Issued on Bank of America, N.A. Answer Due 1/25/2019 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pretrial Conference set for 03/06/2019 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Catala, Nilda) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit to Defer Filing Fee (Complaint) [Trustee]
Wed 12/26 11:58 AM
Trustee's Affidavit to Defer Complaint Filing Fee. Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/21 6:08 PM
Adversary case 18-01506 Complaint by Marcia T Dunn against Bank of America, N.A.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Transfers |