Dunn v. Shea et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-26856
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-26856
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01511 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Susan Colleen Shea
1002 E Renee Dr
Phoenix, AZ 85024 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Susan Shea Arabiens Shea Training
1002 E Renee Dr
Phoenix, AZ 85024 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcia T Dunn
66 West Flagler Street
Miami, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)
Fri 07/21 7:45 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by SS. Receipt Number 322150. (admin) |
||
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 08/09 12:53 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1511 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Dismissal [Adversary]
Mon 07/15 3:37 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (Voluntary). Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 03/08 2:55 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Continue Hearing Order
Fri 03/01 10:38 AM
Order Granting Ex Parte Motion To Continue Pre-Trial Conference and Trial On: (1 Complaint). Pretrial Conference set for 08/07/2019 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Barr, Ida) |
|
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Continue Hearing
Thu 02/28 5:25 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Initial Disclosure (Rule 26)
Wed 02/13 9:31 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements (Expert Witnesses) Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Initial Disclosure (Rule 26)
Wed 02/06 5:23 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 01/08 7:23 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 01/08 7:22 PM
Summons Service Executed on Susan Colleen Shea 1/8/2019; Susan Shea Arabiens Shea Training 1/8/2019 Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn, Defendants Susan Colleen Shea, Susan Shea Arabiens Shea Training. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Fri 12/28 5:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Michael P Dunn Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Dunn, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, December 26, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order Setting Requirements (Adv)
Wed 12/26 5:22 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Covington, Katrinka) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Wed 12/26 5:22 PM
Summons Issued on Susan Colleen Shea Answer Due 1/25/2019; Susan Shea Arabiens Shea Training Answer Due 1/25/2019 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pretrial Conference set for 03/06/2019 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Covington, Katrinka) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit to Defer Filing Fee (Complaint) [Trustee]
Wed 12/26 12:02 PM
Trustee's Affidavit to Defer Complaint Filing Fee. Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/21 7:43 PM
Adversary case 18-01511 Complaint by Marcia T Dunn against Susan Colleen Shea, Susan Shea Arabiens Shea Training. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Transfers |