Dunn v. Koessler
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-26856
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-26856
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01514 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Shanon Koessler
7463 SW 188th Terrace
Cutler Bay, FL 33157 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcia T Dunn
66 West Flagler Street
Miami, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)
Fri 07/21 7:45 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by SS. Receipt Number 322153. (admin) |
||
Monday, July 26, 2021 | ||
47 | 47
misc
Amended Document
Mon 07/26 4:53 PM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Date of Answer Filed by Garnishee. Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Turner, Barry) |
|
46 | 46
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 07/26 4:30 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Answer. , Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Turner, Barry) |
|
45 | 45
answer
Answer to Writ of Garnishment
Mon 07/26 4:08 PM
Answer to Writ of Garnishment Filed by Attorney JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Herron, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
44 | 44
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 07/21 1:13 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Writ of Garnishment , Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, July 16, 2021 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/16 1:37 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Turner, Barry) |
|
42 | 42
court
Writ of Garnishment
Fri 07/16 11:50 AM
COPY OF ISSUED Writ of Garnishment (Original Mailed to Plaintiff on 7/16/21) (Cohen, Diana) |
|
41 | 41
order
Writ Order
Fri 07/16 11:30 AM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Application for Writ of Garnishment to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Cohen, Diana) |
|
Wednesday, July 14, 2021 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Writ of Garnishment Application
Wed 07/14 1:43 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Writ of Garnishment to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn (Turner, Barry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Default Final Judgment | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "2" - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Writ of Garnishment | ||
Wednesday, February 10, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 02/10 10:58 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Turner, Barry) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
order
Writ Order
Tue 02/09 7:26 AM
Order Denying Without Prejudice Application for Writ Of Garnishment And Quashing Issued Writ Of Garnishment (Barr, Ida) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
37 | 37
court
Writ of Garnishment
Mon 02/01 2:21 PM
COPY OF ISSUED Writ of Garnishment(Original Mailed to Plaintiff on 2/1/2021) (Rodriguez, Olga) |
|
Friday, January 29, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Writ of Garnishment Application
Fri 01/29 2:11 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Writ of Garnishment to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn (Turner, Barry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Writ of Garnishment | ||
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 08/07 9:56 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1514 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/23 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/22/2020. (Admin.) |
|
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/23 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/22/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/20 1:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
31 | 31
court
Notice of Entry of Judgment
Mon 04/20 7:47 AM
Notice of Entry (Barr, Ida) |
|
30 | 30
order
Default Judgment [Order]
Mon 04/20 7:44 AM
Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Shanon Koessler . (Barr, Ida) |
|
29 | 29
order
Default Judgment Order
Mon 04/20 7:38 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Final Judgment (Barr, Ida) |
|
Friday, March 13, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK
Sat 03/14 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Date 03/13/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/11 3:05 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
26 | 26
court
Notice of Hearing (AP)
Wed 03/11 2:42 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 04/15/2020 at 02:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 03/11 2:30 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Shanon Koessler. Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" - Default Final Judgment | ||
Saturday, November 23, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 11/24 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 11/23/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 11/21 4:06 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Shanon Koessler (Barr, Ida) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Default
Wed 11/20 5:01 PM
Motion for Default Against Defendant Shanon Koessler Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Non-Military Affidavit | ||
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/08 5:15 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
order
Miscellaneous Motion Order
Wed 08/07 12:33 PM
Order Granting Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint Re: #15 (Barr, Ida) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 08/02 3:06 PM
Amended Complaint by Marcia T Dunn against Shanon Koessler. Complaint Amended to reduce amount being sought. . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
court
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Wed 07/17 10:08 AM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Hearing (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 07/16 11:31 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
16 | 16
court
Notice of Hearing (AP)
Tue 07/16 11:05 AM
Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 08/01/2019 at 09:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Motion
Mon 07/15 4:20 PM
Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Amended Complaint | ||
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 03/08 2:51 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Continue Hearing Order
Fri 03/01 10:34 AM
Order Granting Ex Parte Motion To Continue Pretrial Conference And Trial On: (1 Complaint). Pretrial Conference set for 08/07/2019 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Barr, Ida) Modified text on 3/1/2019 (Barr, Ida) |
|
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Continue Hearing
Thu 02/28 7:08 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Initial Disclosure (Rule 26)
Wed 02/13 9:35 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements (Expert Witnesses) Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 02/11 4:26 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
9 | 9
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 02/11 4:21 PM
Summons Service Executed on Shanon Koessler 2/11/2019 Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn, Defendant Shanon Koessler. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Initial Disclosure (Rule 26)
Wed 02/06 5:41 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 01/08 8:29 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn . (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 01/08 8:29 PM
Summons Service Executed on Shanon Koessler 1/8/2019 Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn, Defendant Shanon Koessler. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Fri 12/28 5:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Michael P Dunn Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Dunn, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, December 26, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order Setting Requirements (Adv)
Wed 12/26 11:23 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Covington, Katrinka) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Wed 12/26 11:22 PM
Summons Issued on Shanon Koessler Answer Due 1/25/2019 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pretrial Conference set for 03/06/2019 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Covington, Katrinka) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit to Defer Filing Fee (Complaint) [Trustee]
Wed 12/26 12:05 PM
Trustee's Affidavit to Defer Complaint Filing Fee. Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T Dunn. (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/21 8:00 PM
Adversary case 18-01514 Complaint by Marcia T Dunn against Shanon Koessler. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Kligler, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Transfers |