Julian Bivins v. Keith Stein, et al
Original Case: 9:15-cv-81298
Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-prici-14978 |
Type | private civil / diversity |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 28, 2018 3:28 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
KEITH B. STEIN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BEYS LISTON MOBARGHA & BERLAND LLP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LAW OFFICES OF KEITH B. STEIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JULIAN BIVINS
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 20 2018
Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Julian Bivins. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Per Curiam. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions. |
Docket last updated: 12/28/2018 3:28 AM EST |