Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:18-ap-04201
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2018
Terminated:Jun 19, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mid-State Reclamation, Inc.
21955 Grenada Avenue
Lakeville, MN 55044
Plaintiff
JOHN R STOEBNER
120 S 6TH ST STE 2500
MINNEAPOLIS, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
Gordon B Conn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
20 20 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Wed 06/19 2:11 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by JOHN R STOEBNER and Mid-State Reclamation, Inc.. Proposed order.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Wed 06/19 2:50 PM
Disposition of adversary 4:18-ap-4201. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Wed 06/19 2:52 PM
Adversary case 4:18-ap-4201 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
19 19 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Mon 05/20 2:28 PM
Stipulation filed by JOHN R STOEBNER and Mid-State Reclamation, Inc.. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/09 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/08/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/09 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/08/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
16 16 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Thu 03/07 2:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/6/2019 9:30:00 AM ]. File Size [ 8139 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:16:57 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
15 15 order MNB Default judgment - motion Wed 03/06 2:49 PM
Order Denying Motion for default judgment Related [+] (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-] 10
14 14 order MNB Scheduling order Wed 03/06 12:36 PM
Scheduling order Motions Due: 6/10/2019. Discovery due by 5/10/2019. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Wed 03/06 10:46 AM
Minutes re: Related [+] Andrew Stoebner appeared for Plaintiff; George Singer appeared for Defendant. Mr. Stoebner to file an affidavit of attorneys fees. Motion for Default is denied. Parties to chose a private mediator. Scheduling order to be entered. (Kristin)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for default judgment filed by JOHN R STOEBNER
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
13 13 answer MNB Objection Tue 03/05 3:56 PM
Objection by Defendant Mid-State Reclamation, Inc. to10 Motion for default judgment. (Singer, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C
Monday, March 04, 2019
12 12 answer MNB Answer to complaint Mon 03/04 5:39 PM
Answer to complaint with demand for jury trial filed by Mid-State Reclamation, Inc.. (Singer, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2019
11 11 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Fri 03/01 4:42 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Mid-State Reclamation, Inc. and George H. Singer.. (Singer, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 28, 2019
court MNB Public entry Thu 02/28 2:59 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO MID-STATE RECLAMATION, INC. RE:1 Complaint (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
10 10 motion MNB Motion for default judgment Tue 02/19 2:06 PM
Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff JOHN R STOEBNER. Affidavit of default, Affidavit of identification, Affidavit on the merits, Proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law and order for judgment, Certificate of service. Hearing scheduled 3/6/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 02, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 02/02 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 02/02/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 01, 2019
8 8 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Fri 02/01 2:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/31/2019 9:30:00 AM ]. File Size [ 1426 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:58 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
7 7 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Thu 01/31 10:55 AM
Amended Order for telephonic scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/20/2019 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM) Modified on 1/31/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Thu 01/31 1:19 PM
Minutes re: Related [+] Gordon Conn appeared for Plaintiff. Scheduling conerence set for 2/20/19. Hearing will be stricken if Motion for Default is filed prior to the hearing.(Kristin)
Related: [-] 5 Order for scheduling conference
Saturday, January 26, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/26 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 01/26/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 24, 2019
5 5 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Thu 01/24 3:40 PM
Order for scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 09:30 AM, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
4 4 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Thu 01/24 3:35 PM
Order for TELEPHONIC scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/31/2019, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 02, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 01/02 10:20 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by JOHN R STOEBNER.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Friday, December 28, 2018
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Fri 12/28 2:33 PM
Summons issued on Mid-State Reclamation, Inc. Date Issued 12/28/2018, Answer Due 1/28/2019 (Alicia MNBM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 27, 2018
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Thu 12/27 3:59 PM
Adversary case 18-04201 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by JOHN R STOEBNER against Mid-State Reclamation, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]