Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-42726

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kathleen H Sanberg
Case #: 4:18-ap-04203
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2018
Terminated:Sep 26, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wearhaus Inc.
1933 Davis Street Suite 237
San Leandro, CA 94587
Plaintiff
Nauni Manty, Trustee
Manty & Associates PA 401 Second Ave N Suite 400
Minneapolis, MN 55401
Represented By
Christopher A. Camardello
Manty & Associates, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Thursday, September 26, 2019
court MNB Close adversary case Thu 09/26 1:23 PM
Adversary case 4:18-ap-4203 closed (Kathy MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
6 6 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Wed 09/18 12:17 PM
Notice of dismissal filed by Nauni Manty, Trustee. (Camardello, Christopher)
Related: [-]
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Wed 09/18 2:23 PM
Disposition of adversary 4:18-ap-4203. Disposition: dismissed with prejudice. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
court MNB Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Wed 06/05 1:03 PM
Minutes re:5 Motion for default judgment. Continued to July 17, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. Notice of continued hearing to be filed. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
court MNB Public entry Tue 05/28 8:57 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT WEARHAUS, INC. re:1 Complaint (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
5 5 motion MNB Motion for default judgment Wed 05/22 11:21 AM
Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff Nauni Manty, Trustee. Affidavit of default, Affidavit of identification, Affidavit on the merits, Proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law and order for judgment, Certificate of service. Hearing scheduled 6/5/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Camardello, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 04, 2019
4 4 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Fri 01/04 5:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 207416. (admin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Fri 01/04 2:53 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Nauni Manty, Trustee.(Camardello, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Fri 01/04 2:26 PM
Summons issued on Wearhaus Inc. Date Issued 1/4/2019, Answer Due 2/4/2019 (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Receipt number and filing fee - generic Fri 01/04 12:29 PM
Filing fee paid for1 Complaint. Receipt number 207416, Fee amount $350.00 (Kristi MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 28, 2018
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Fri 12/28 9:57 AM
Adversary case 18-04203 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Nauni Manty, Trustee against Wearhaus Inc.. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350 (Camardello, Christopher)
Related: [-]