Original Case: 1:14-cv-02028

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-cv-01001
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2019
Terminated:Apr 01, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 02, 2019 3:33 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
YAHOO! INC.
Represented By
Christopher Chorba
GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
YAHOO! INC., now known as OATH HOLDINGS INC
Represented By
Timothy Loose
GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP
contact info
Perlette M. Jura
GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP
contact info
Christopher Chorba
GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP
contact info
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
RACHEL JOHNSON, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By
Keith J. Keogh
KEOGH LAW, LTD
contact info
Timothy J. Sostrin
KEOGH LAW, LTD
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2019 3:32 AM CDT
Wednesday, January 02, 2019
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Rachel Johnson by 01/04/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 01/16/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/11/2019 for Rachel Johnson. [1] [6974998] 19-1001 (AG) [Entered: 01/02/2019 11:55 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 80 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court