Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Manish S Shah
Case #: 1:14-cv-02028
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2014
Last checked: Thursday Dec 11, 2014 5:57 AM CST
Service List
Represented By
Alexander I. Arezina
contact info
Peter Scott Lubin
Ditommaso Lubin, P.C.
contact info
Vincent Louis DiTommaso
Ditommaso Lubin, P.C.
contact info
John Auchter
Ditommaso Lubin, P.C.
contact info
Patrick Doyle Austermuehle
Ditommaso Lubin, P.C.
contact info
John Robert McInerney
Ditommaso Lubin, P.C.
contact info
Andrew Charles Murphy
Ditommaso Lubin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By
Francis A Citera
Greenberg Traurig, Llp.
contact info
Lori Chang
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Ian Charles Ballon
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Lucia Lynn Marker-Moore
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Justin Alexander Barton
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachel Johnson
Represented By
Michael S. Hilicki
Keogh Law, Ltd
contact info
Katherine Marie Bowen
Keogh Law, Ltd
contact info
Timothy J. Sostrin
Keogh Law, Ltd.
contact info
Keith James Keogh
Keogh Law, Ltd.
contact info

GPO Dec 11 2014
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/11/2014: In case no. 14-cv-02028, Yahoo!'s motion for summary judgment 26 is denied. Johnson's motion to exclude the expert report of Monica Desai 60 is denied. In case no. 14-cv-02753, Yahoo!'s motion for summary judgment 21 is denied. [For further detail see attached order.] (psm, )
GPO Jan 04 2016
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 1/4/2016: Plaintiffs' motion for class certification 125 is granted in part, and denied in part. The following class is certified: "All persons within the United States to whose cellular telephone number Yahoo! sent the Welcome Message during the period commencing March 1, 2013 through March 31, 2013, while such cellular number was assigned to Sprint, and whose cellular telephone number is not associated with a Yahoo! user in Yahoo!s records." Plaintiff Johnson is designated the representative of this class. Plaintiffs' motions to strike, 141 and 144, are denied. [For further detail see attached order.] Mailed notice. (psm, )
GPO Feb 13 2018
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 2/13/2018: Defendant's motion to decertify the class, 281, is granted. The parties shall appear for a status hearing on February 28, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed. (psm, )
Docket last updated: 01/05/2016 4:27 PM CST
Friday, March 21, 2014
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (daj, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rachel Johnson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9317656.(Keogh, Keith)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Keogh, Keith)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rachel Johnson by Keith James Keogh (Keogh, Keith)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Rachel Johnson to certify class(Keogh, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rachel Johnson by Timothy J. Sostrin (Sostrin, Timothy)
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rachel Johnson by Katherine Marie Bowen (Bowen, Katherine)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE of Motion by Keith James Keogh for presentment of motion to certify class4 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/3/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Keogh, Keith)
Related: [-]