University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc. v. Bioferm Energy Systems et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-28077
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-28077
Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | G Michael Halfenger |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-02008 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Bioferm Energy Systems
440 Science Dr., Ste. 300
Madison, WI 53711 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
BIOFerm USA, Inc.
440 Science Drive Suite 300
Madison, WI 53711 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc.
625 Pearl Avenue
Oshkosh, WI 54901 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Order
Mon 04/22 9:47 AM
Proposed Order RE:8 - Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Attorney Carrie Sue Werle of Steinhilber Swanson LLP on behalf of University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc.. (Werle, Carrie) |
|
court
Defective Filing Notification - Proposed Orders
Mon 04/22 8:38 AM
Defective Filing Notification - Action Required by the Filer: The proposed order was filed as an attachment to the motion. Orders must be docketed using the proposed order event. Please refile the proposed order using the correct event. . (amg, Deputy Clerk) |
||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 04/22 10:07 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:19-ap-2008 - Dismissed (amg, Deputy Clerk) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 04/22 10:09 AM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2008 Closed (amg, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 04/19 3:24 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Carrie Sue Werle of Steinhilber Swanson LLP on behalf of Plaintiff University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc.. (Werle, Carrie) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
utility
Court Minutes/Order (GMH Virtual Event)
Wed 03/13 1:30 AM
ORDER: The Debtor, University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc., has requested that the court hold in abeyance the dismissal of this adversary proceeding until after the conclusion of the March 25 confirmation hearing or confirmation of the plan in the plaintiff's chapter 11 case. For the reasons stated in the plaintiff-debtor's March 12 statement concerning position on dismissal, that request is granted. No more than 14 days after the later of plan confirmation or the completion of the March 25 confirmation hearing, plaintiff must file for dismissal of this adversary proceeding under Rule 7041 or must file correspondence explaining why dismissal is not appropriate. . (Halfenger, G.) |
||
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Correspondence
Tue 03/12 10:35 AM
Correspondence - Statement Concerning Position on Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Paul G. Swanson on behalf of University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc.. . (Swanson, Paul) |
|
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 03/01 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document . Notice Date 02/28/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
Show Cause
Tue 02/26 1:55 PM
Court Minutes from hearing held on 2/25/2019 and Order for the Plaintiff Show Cause in Writing Why This Proceeding Should Not Be Dismissed. (amg, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
audio
Upload Audio File
Mon 02/25 2:06 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 02/25/2019 1:26:44 PM ]. File Size [ 160 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:20 ]. (Pre-trial conference). (admin) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 01/11 10:54 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc. (Swanson, Paul) |
|
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 01/10 12:06 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004, and file a certificate of service with the Court. Answer Due by 2/11/2019. United States and its offices and agencies answer due by 2/14/2019. Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/25/2019 at 01:00 PM at Telephone Hearing. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-684-8852, and enter access code 7183566 before the scheduled hearing time. (saa, Law Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/09 9:58 AM
Adversary case 19-02008 Complaint by University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc. (attorney Paul G. Swanson) against Bioferm Energy Systems, BIOFerm USA, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer),02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))(Swanson, Paul) |