Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04012
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2019
Terminated:Aug 06, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kennametal Inc.
1600 TECHNOLOGY WAY
Latrobe, PA 15650
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch 120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
19 19 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 08/07 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 08/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Tue 08/06 7:32 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4012. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Tue 08/06 7:35 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4012 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2019
17 17 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Mon 08/05 4:46 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Kennametal Inc.. Proposed order.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
16 16 order MNB Order for status conference Mon 08/05 1:16 PM
Order for telephonic status conference for 8/9/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (David T MNB)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
15 15 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Fri 06/28 1:18 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Kennametal Inc.. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/09 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/08/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
13 13 order MNB Scheduling order Wed 03/06 1:03 PM
Scheduling order Motions Due: 5/31/2019. Discovery due by 4/30/2019. Trial date set for 6/25/2019 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/01 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/01/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
11 11 order MNB Order (Generic) Wed 02/27 11:31 AM
Order Referring Matter for Mediation. (Lauren MNB)
Related: [-]
10 10 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Wed 02/27 10:01 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/26/2019 2:30:00 PM ]. File Size [ 17811 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:12:22 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
9 9 answer MNB Answer to complaint Fri 02/22 3:00 PM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by Kennametal Inc.. (Brand, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Fri 02/22 1:55 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Kennametal Inc. and James C. Brand. (Brand, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
7 7 order MNB Order for status conference Wed 02/20 3:15 PM
Order for telephonic status conference. Status Conference set for 2/26/2019 at 02:30 PM. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
6 6 order MNB Order (Generic) Wed 02/20 3:06 PM
Order Extending Answer Deadline. Answer due: February 23, 2019. Re: Related [+] (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation
Friday, February 15, 2019
5 5 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Fri 02/15 2:46 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Kennametal Inc.. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 17, 2019
4 4 misc MNB Certificate of service Thu 01/17 3:06 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons for adversary proceeding
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
3 3 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Wed 01/16 2:44 PM
Summons issued on Kennametal Inc. Date Issued 1/16/2019, Answer Due 2/15/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
2 2 trustee MNB Trustee's statement of insufficient funds to pay filing fees Wed 01/16 2:27 PM
Trustee's statement of insufficient funds to pay filing fees.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Wed 01/16 2:05 PM
Adversary case 19-04012 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Kennametal Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]