Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04013
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2019
Terminated:Apr 29, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Scott Jerde Trucking, LLC
5455 Bryant St
Maple Plain, MN 55359
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch 120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
14 14 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Mon 04/29 7:36 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4013. Disposition: Dismissed. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Mon 04/29 7:36 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4013 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
13 13 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Fri 04/26 2:54 PM
Notice of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee Proof of service.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
12 12 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 04/02 2:01 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation
11 11 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 04/02 11:52 AM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Christopher J. Harayda and Doron Yitzchaki, Attorneys for Callidus Capital Corporatio and Midwest Asphalt LLC. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: to Entry of Orders Staying Certain Adversary Proceedings(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
10 10 notice MNB Notice of continued hearing Tue 03/26 1:00 PM
Notice of continued hearing Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee. Proof of service.. Hearing to be held on 4/10/2019 at 09:45 AM Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for default judgment9 Motion for default judgment
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
court MNB Public entry Tue 03/19 8:04 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO Scott Jerde Trucking, LLC re:1 Complaint (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
9 9 motion MNB Motion for default judgment Mon 03/11 4:34 PM
Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff John R. Stoebner, Trustee. Affidavit of default, Affidavit of identification, Affidavit on the merits, Proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law and order for judgment, Certificate of service. Hearing scheduled 3/26/2019 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/01 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/01/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
7 7 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Wed 02/27 10:01 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/26/2019 2:40:00 PM ]. File Size [ 2283 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:35 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
6 6 order MNB Order for status conference Wed 02/27 9:34 AM
Order for telephonic status conference. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge William J. Fisher. (Lauren MNB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
5 5 order MNB Order for status conference Wed 02/20 3:17 PM
Order for telephonic status conference. Status Conference set for 2/26/2019 at 02:40 PM. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 17, 2019
4 4 misc MNB Certificate of service Thu 01/17 3:24 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons for adversary proceeding
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
3 3 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Wed 01/16 2:46 PM
Summons issued on Scott Jerde Trucking, LLC Date Issued 1/16/2019, Answer Due 2/15/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
2 2 trustee MNB Trustee's statement of insufficient funds to pay filing fees Wed 01/16 2:30 PM
Trustee's statement of insufficient funds to pay filing fees.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Wed 01/16 2:11 PM
Adversary case 19-04013 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Scott Jerde Trucking, LLC. No Fee. (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]