Original Case: 0:15-cv-60334

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-prici-10222
Typeprivate civil / diversity
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2019
Last checked: Monday Jan 21, 2019 3:19 AM EST
Defendant - Appellant
RAYMOND JAMES & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By
Matthew C. Pilsner
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
G. Calvin Hayes
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Samuel Wayne Braver
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JYLL BRINK
Represented By
Randall Charles Place
Law Offices of Place & Hanley, PLLC
contact info
Lyle E. Shapiro
Herskowitz Shapiro, PLLC
contact info
Joshua Lee Spoont
Sodhi Spoont, PLLC
contact info
Mark A. Romance
Richman Greer, PA
contact info
Nathaniel M. Edenfield
Richman Greer, PA
contact info
Sara Elizabeth Hanley
Law Offices of Place & Hanley, PLLC
contact info
Gary S. Betensky
Richman Greer, PA
contact info
Eric Mathew Sodhi
Sodhi Spoont, PLLC
contact info
Manuel A. Garcia-Linares
Richman Greer, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/21/2019 3:19 AM EST
Friday, January 18, 2019
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. on 01/18/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/01/2019 as to Appellant Raymond James & Associates, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/15/2019 as to Appellee Jyll Brink
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 2 pgs Docket #10 Letter
Att: 3 30 pgs Original Petition