Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04021
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2019
Terminated:Aug 30, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Huhn Trucking, Inc.
1505 20th Street SE
Buffalo, MN 55313
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Thomson Stoebner & Pusch
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
15 15 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Fri 08/30 9:01 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4021. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Fri 08/30 9:04 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4021 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
14 14 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Thu 08/29 4:40 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and David J. Lenhardt, Attorney for Huhn Trucking, Inc.. Proposed order.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
13 13 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 07/16 1:10 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Huhn Trucking, Inc.. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2019
12 12 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Thu 06/27 4:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/26/2019 10:00:00 AM ]. File Size [ 9147 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:21 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order Wed 06/26 10:14 AM
Minutes re: Related [+] Appearances by Andrew J. Stoebner for the Plaintiff and David J. Lenhardt for the Defendant. Order for settlement conference on Monday, July 1, at 10:30 a.m. to be entered. (DavidT)
Related: [-] 10 Order setting hearing
Saturday, June 15, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 06/15 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 06/15/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2019
10 10 order MNB Order setting hearing Thu 06/13 11:07 AM
Order for telephonic status conference on 6/26/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (David T MNB)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/29 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/29/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
8 8 order MNB Scheduling order Wed 03/27 3:04 PM
Scheduling order Motions Due: 6/28/2019. Discovery due by 5/31/2019. Trial date set for 7/15/2019 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/21 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/21/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
6 6 order MNB Order (Generic) Mon 03/18 5:35 PM
Order Referring Matter for Mediation (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order Fri 03/15 3:17 PM
Minutes re:5 Order for scheduling conference. Andrew Stoebner appeared for Plaintiff; David Lenhardt appeared for Defendant. Matter to be referred for mediation with a private mediator. Parties consent to entry of final order. Discovery deadline May 31, 2019; Motion deadline June 30, 2019. Trial date to be scheduled. (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
5 5 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Fri 03/08 11:09 AM
Order for scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 02:30 PM. Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2019
4 4 answer MNB Answer to complaint Fri 03/01 12:45 PM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by Huhn Trucking, Inc.. (Lenhardt, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Thu 01/31 11:47 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 01/29 10:23 AM
Summons issued on Huhn Trucking, Inc. Date Issued 1/29/2019, Answer Due 2/28/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 28, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 01/28 4:09 PM
Adversary case 19-04021 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Huhn Trucking, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds