Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04022
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2019
Terminated:Jul 16, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
W.D. Larson Companies LTD, Inc.
500 Ford Road
St. Louis Park,, MN 55426
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Thomson Stoebner & Pusch
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
15 15 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Tue 07/16 8:24 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4022. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Tue 07/16 8:27 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4022 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2019
14 14 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Mon 07/15 12:39 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and W. D. Larson Companies LTD, Inc., d/b/a Allstate Peterbilt. Proposed order.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
13 13 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 06/11 3:45 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and W.D. Larson Companies LTD, Inc. d/b/a Allstate Peterbilt. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 12, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 05/12 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/12/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
11 11 order MNB Scheduling order Fri 05/10 3:17 PM
Scheduling order. Mediation set for 6/26/19 at 9:00 at Courtroom 2C, 2nd Floor, 316 North Robert Street, St Paul, with Judge Constantine. Trial date set for 6/26/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2019
10 10 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Thu 05/09 1:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/8/2019 10:00:00 AM ]. File Size [ 6354 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:13:14 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Wed 05/08 2:23 PM
Minutes re: Related [+] Andrew Stoebner appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. William Topka appeared on behalf of the Defendant. Order for trial to be entered. Mediation to occur one hour before trial. (wmark)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for default judgment filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
9 9 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Wed 04/24 3:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/24/2019 10:00:00 AM ]. File Size [ 8547 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:56 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court MNB Hearing continued other Wed 04/24 9:56 AM
Hearing continued re: Related [+] Andrew Stoebner appeared for Plaintiff; William Topka appeared for Defendant. Hearing Continued. Hearing to be held on 05/08/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for default judgment filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee
Friday, April 12, 2019
8 8 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Fri 04/12 12:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/10/2019 10:00:00 AM ]. File Size [ 5650 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:46 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
court MNB Hearing continued other Wed 04/10 10:37 AM
Hearing continued re: Related [+] Andrew Stoebner appeared for Plaintiff. William Topka appeared for Defendant. Motion continued. Hearing to be held on 04/24/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for default judgment filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
7 7 answer MNB Response Tue 04/02 1:18 PM
Response to6 Motion for default judgment filed by Defendant W.D. Larson Companies LTD, Inc.. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law. (Topka, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
6 6 motion MNB Motion for default judgment Thu 03/21 2:12 PM
Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff John R. Stoebner, Trustee. Affidavit of default, Affidavit of identification, Affidavit on the merits, Proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law and order for judgment, Certificate of service. Hearing scheduled 4/10/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
court MNB Public entry Thu 03/21 3:21 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO W.D. Larson Companies, LTD, Inc. re:1 Complaint (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order Fri 03/15 3:19 PM
Minutes re:4 Order for scheduling conference. Andrew Stoebner appeared for Plaintiff; no appearance by Defendant. Plaintiff to file motion for default judgment. (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 10, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 03/11 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/10/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
4 4 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Fri 03/08 11:17 AM
Order for telephonic scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 02:45 PM. Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Thu 01/31 11:48 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 01/29 11:11 AM
Summons issued on W.D. Larson Companies LTD, Inc. Date Issued 1/29/2019, Answer Due 2/28/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 28, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 01/28 4:31 PM
Adversary case 19-04022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against W.D. Larson Companties LTD. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds