Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:19-cv-00226
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2019
Re-opened:May 10, 2022
Terminated:Sep 29, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 05, 2019 2:50 AM PDT
Defendant
Watkins & Letofsky, LLP
8215 S. Eastern Ave Ste 265 Las Vegas
Las Vegas, NV 89123
Represented By
Brian S. Letofsky
Watkins & Letofsky, LLP
contact info
Daniel R Watkins
Watkins And Letofsky
contact info
Eran Scott Forster
Watkins & Letofsky
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Buchanan
Represented By
James P. Kemp
Kemp & Kemp
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, October 10, 2024
75 75 appeal Notice Appeal Thu 10/10 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to74 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by Plaintiff Amy Buchanan. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANVDC-7837302. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for appeal can be found on the Court's website at [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Kemp, James)
Related: [-]