Original Case: 2:19-cv-00226

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-15633
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2021
Terminated:Apr 07, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Apr 09, 2022 1:24 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
WATKINS & LETOFSKY, LLP
Represented By
Brian Letofsky
Watkins & Letosky LLP
contact info
Brian Samuel Letofsky
Watkins & Letofsky
contact info
Daniel R. Watkins
Watkins & Letofsky, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
AMY BUCHANAN
Represented By
James P. Kemp
KEMP & KEMP
contact info

GPO Apr 07 2022
FILED OPINION (M. MARGARET MCKEOWN, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and KATHRYN H. VRATIL) REVERSED and REMANDED. Opinion by Judge Vratil. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [12414551]

Docket last updated: 04/09/2022 1:24 AM PDT
Monday, April 12, 2021
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Amy Buchanan Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/19/2021. Transcript ordered by 05/10/2021. Transcript due 06/08/2021. Appellant Amy Buchanan opening brief due 07/19/2021. Appellee Watkins & Letofsky, LLP answering brief due 08/18/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12070314] (JBS) [Entered: 04/12/2021 09:09 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet
Att: 5 1 pgs Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing
Att: 6 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule