REO Management Solutions, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-10412
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-10412
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | James L Garrity Jr |
Case #: | 1:19-bk-10421 |
Case Filed: | Feb 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50,001-100,000 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
REO Management Solutions, LLC
14405 Walters Rd Ste 200
Houston, TX 77014-1345 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago |
Tuesday, February 22, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order, Final Decree
Tue 02/22 9:08 AM
Order of Final Decree signed on 2/19/2022. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 02/22 9:54 AM
Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Saturday, March 30, 2019 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Sat 03/30 5:55 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated: All Schedules (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Thu 03/28 1:57 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual of REO Management Solutions, LLC (Case No. 19-10421 Filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of REO Management Solutions, LLC. (Singh, Sunny) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Amended Schedules
Thu 03/28 1:55 AM
Amended Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule C - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual of REO Management Solutions, LLC (Case No. 19-10421 Filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of REO Management Solutions, LLC. (Singh, Sunny) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Schedules
Thu 03/28 1:29 AM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule C - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual of REO Management Solutions, Inc. (Case No. 19-10421 Filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of REO Management Solutions, LLC. (Singh, Sunny) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 03/28 2:01 AM
Receipt of Amended Schedules([LINK 19-10421 jlg] ) [misc,schaja] ( 31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13113317. Fee amount 31.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Application, Extend Time to File Schedules
Fri 02/15 10:34 AM
Order signed on 2/14/2019 Granting Application to Extend Time to File Schedules. Deadline: March 27, 2019 (Rodriguez, Willie) |
|
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Fri 02/15 11:04 AM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC, added to the case. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 02/14 12:23 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 02/13/2019. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Wed 02/13 10:23 PM
Order signed on 2/13/2019 in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Ditech Holding Corporation; DF Insurance Agency LLC; Ditech Financial LLC; Green Tree Credit LLC; Green Tree Credit Solutions LLC; Green Tree Insurance Agency of Nevada, Inc.; Green Tree Investment Holdings III LLC; Green Tree Servicing Corp.; Marix Servicing LLC; Mortgage Asset Systems, LLC; REO Management Solutions, LLC; Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.; Walter Management Holding Company LLC; and Walter Reverse Acquisition LLC. The docket in Case No. 19-10412 (JLG) should be consulted for all matters affecting the cases. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Application, Extend Time to File Schedules
Wed 02/13 4:01 PM
Application to Extend Time to File Schedules / Motion of Debtors for Entry of Order Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Rule 2015.3 Financial Reports filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of REO Management Solutions, LLC. (Singh, Sunny) |
|
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Wed 02/13 10:39 PM
Case Jointly Administered with 19-10412 (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 02/11 11:14 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Michael E. Wiles to Judge James L. Garrity, Jr.. Judge James L. Garrity, Jr. added to the case. (Acosta, Annya) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Mon 02/11 5:32 AM
Motion for Joint Administration / Motion of Debtors for Entry of Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of REO Management Solutions, LLC. (Singh, Sunny) |
|
3 | 3
ans
Declaration
Mon 02/11 5:31 AM
Declaration of Gerald A. Lombardo Pursuant to Rule 1007-2 of Local Bankruptcy Rules for Southern District of New York filed by Sunny Singh on behalf of REO Management Solutions, LLC. (Singh, Sunny) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Amended Voluntary Petition
Mon 02/11 5:09 AM
Amended Voluntary Petition. Filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of REO Management Solutions, LLC. (Schrock, Ray) |
|
1 | 1
53
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 02/11 4:49 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 02/25/2019. Schedule C due 02/25/2019. Schedule D due 02/25/2019. Schedule E/F due 02/25/2019. Schedule G due 02/25/2019. Schedule H due 02/25/2019. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 02/25/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs due 02/25/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 02/25/2019, Filed by Ray C Schrock of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP on behalf of Mortgage Asset Systems, LLC. (Schrock, Ray) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 02/11 5:57 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 19-10421 ) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B13024017. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Add Judge
Mon 02/11 8:33 AM
Judge Michael E. Wiles added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |