Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04029
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2019
Terminated:May 01, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
W.B. Miller, Inc.
22491 Garnet Street NW
Elk River, MN 55330
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info
John R. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Stoebner & Pusch, Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
9 9 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Wed 05/01 12:49 PM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4029. Disposition: Dismissed. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Wed 05/01 12:50 PM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4029 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
8 8 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Fri 04/26 3:05 PM
Notice of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee Proof of service.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
7 7 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 04/02 2:03 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation
6 6 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 04/02 11:58 AM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Christopher J. Harayda and Doron Yitzchaki, Attorneys for Callidus Capital Corporation and Midwest Asphalt LLC. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: to Entry of Orders Staying Certain Adversary Proceedings(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
5 5 motion MNB Motion for default judgment Thu 03/21 2:53 PM
Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff John R. Stoebner, Trustee. Affidavit of default, Affidavit of identification, Affidavit on the merits, Proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law and order for judgment, Certificate of service. Hearing scheduled 4/10/2019 at 10:15 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Thu 03/21 2:32 PM
Order for Telephonic scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 11:15 AM, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Public entry Thu 03/21 3:25 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO W.B. Miller, Inc., re:1 Complaint (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 02/12 2:55 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 02/12 7:50 AM
Summons issued on W.B. Miller, Inc. Date Issued 2/12/2019, Answer Due 3/14/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 02/11 3:20 PM
Adversary case 19-04029 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against W.B. Miller, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds