Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04030
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2019
Terminated:May 01, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gregory Zellmer
6253 Bolland Trail
Inver Grove Heights, MN 55076
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
John R. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Stoebner & Pusch, Chartered
contact info
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
13 13 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Wed 05/01 11:25 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4030. Disposition: Dismissed. (Alicia MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Wed 05/01 11:27 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4030 closed (Alicia MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
12 12 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Fri 04/26 3:58 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Gregory Zellmer, d/b/a Greg Zellmer, Inc.. Proposed order.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Fri 04/26 1:38 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Gregory Zellmer, d/b/a Greg Zellmer, Inc.. Proposed order.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
10 10 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 04/02 2:05 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation
9 9 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 04/02 12:02 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Christopher J. Harayda and Doron Yitzchaki, Attorneys for Callidus Capital Corporation and Midwest Asphalt LLC. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: to Entry of Orders Staying Certain Adversary Proceedings(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 23, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/23 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/23/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
7 7 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Thu 03/21 2:26 PM
Order for Telephonic scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 11:30 AM., Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
6 6 answer MNB Answer to complaint Tue 03/12 2:49 PM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by Gregory Zellmer. (Lamey, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 15, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/15 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 02/15/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
4 4 court MNB Pro bono notice to defendants Wed 02/13 7:26 AM
Pro bono notice to defendants re:1 Complaint. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 02/12 2:55 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 02/12 7:53 AM
Summons issued on Gregory Zellmer Date Issued 2/12/2019, Answer Due 3/14/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 02/11 3:28 PM
Adversary case 19-04030 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Gregory Zellmer. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds