Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04037
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2019
Terminated:Apr 29, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Parking Marking, Inc.
666 Transfer Road, Suite 13
St. Paul,, MN 55114
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
12 12 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Mon 04/29 7:31 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4037. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Mon 04/29 7:33 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4037 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
11 11 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Fri 04/26 2:50 PM
Notice of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee Proof of service.. (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/04 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/03/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
9 9 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 04/02 2:00 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation
8 8 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 04/02 11:38 AM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Christopher J. Harayda and Doron Yitzchaki, Attorneys for Callidus Capital Corporatio and Midwest Asphalt LLC. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: to Entry of Order Staying Certain Adversary Proceedings(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
7 7 order MNB Order (Generic) Mon 04/01 3:37 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Answer Complaint to April 22, 2019. Related [+] (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation
Friday, March 29, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/29 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/29/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Fri 03/29 2:01 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Parking Marking, Inc.. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
4 4 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Wed 03/27 8:33 AM
Order for telephonic scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 12:30 PM, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 02/20 9:15 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 02/19 7:43 AM
Summons issued on Parking Marking, Inc. Date Issued 2/19/2019, Answer Due 3/21/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 18, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 02/18 3:54 PM
Adversary case 19-04037 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Parking Marking, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds