Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04038
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2019
Terminated:May 01, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
R. & D. Trucking, Inc.
18160 Cedar Drive NW
Cedar, MN 55011
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
10 10 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Wed 05/01 1:04 PM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4038. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Wed 05/01 1:05 PM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4038 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
9 9 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Mon 04/29 3:25 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and R. & D. Trucking, Inc.. Proposed order.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
8 8 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 04/02 2:02 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation
7 7 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 04/02 11:55 AM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Christopher J. Harayda and Doron Yitzchaki, Attorneys for Callidus Capital Corporation and Midwest Asphalt LLC. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: to Entry of Orders Staying Certain Adversary Proceedings(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
6 6 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Wed 03/27 8:36 AM
Order for telephonic scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 12:15 PM, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
5 5 answer MNB Answer to complaint Tue 03/12 3:55 PM
Amended Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by R. & D. Trucking, Inc.. (Kipp, Orin)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer MNB Answer to complaint Tue 03/12 9:56 AM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by R. & D. Trucking, Inc.. (Kipp, Orin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 02/20 9:16 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 02/19 7:51 AM
Summons issued on R. & D. Trucking, Inc. Date Issued 2/19/2019, Answer Due 3/21/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 18, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 02/18 4:01 PM
Adversary case 19-04038 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against R. & D. Trucking, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds