Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04039
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2019
Terminated:May 01, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Twin City Outdoor Services, Inc.
14430 21st Avenue North
Plymouth, MN 55447
Plaintiff
John R Stoebner
120 South Sixth Street Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
15 15 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Wed 05/01 11:31 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4039. Disposition: Dismissed. (Alicia MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Wed 05/01 11:33 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4039 closed (Alicia MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
14 14 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Fri 04/26 3:00 PM
Notice of dismissal filed by John R Stoebner. (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 04/24 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/24/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2019
12 12 order MNB Order (Generic) Mon 04/22 4:08 PM
Order Granting Second Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant has until May 6, 2019 to file an answer or response to the Complaint. Related [+] (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation
Thursday, April 18, 2019
11 11 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Thu 04/18 2:12 PM
Stipulation filed by Twin City Outdoor Services, Inc. and John R. Stoebner, Trustee for the Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Estate of Midwest Asphalt Corporation. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint(Glasnovich, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
10 10 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 04/02 2:03 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R Stoebner.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation
9 9 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 04/02 12:00 PM
Stipulation filed by John R Stoebner and Christopher J. Harayda and Doron Yitzchaki, Attorneys for Callidus Capital Corporation and Midwest Asphalt LLC. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: to Entry of Orders Staying Certain Adversary Proceedings(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 03/20 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/20/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
7 7 order MNB Order (Generic) Mon 03/18 5:28 PM
Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. Defendant has until April 22, 2019 to answer Related [+] (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation
Friday, March 15, 2019
6 6 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Fri 03/15 2:25 PM
Stipulation filed by Twin City Outdoor Services, Inc. and John R. Stoebner, Trustee for the Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Estate of Midwest Asphalt Corporation. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint(Glasnovich, Andrew)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Fri 03/15 2:22 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Twin City Outdoor Services, Inc. and Andrew J. Glasnovich. Proof of service.. (Glasnovich, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Fri 03/15 2:19 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Twin City Outdoor Services, Inc. and Benjamin J. Court. Proof of service.. (Court, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 02/20 9:18 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R Stoebner.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 02/19 7:58 AM
Summons issued on Twin City Outdoor Services, Inc. Date Issued 2/19/2019, Answer Due 3/21/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 18, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 02/18 4:08 PM
Adversary case 19-04039 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R Stoebner against Twin City Outdoor Services, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds