Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04048
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2019
Terminated:May 01, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ron Kassa Construction, Inc.
6005 250th Street East
Elko, MN 55050
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
9 9 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Wed 05/01 11:22 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4048. Disposition: Dismissed. (Alicia MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Wed 05/01 11:24 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4048 closed (Alicia MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
8 8 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Fri 04/26 3:55 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Ron Kassa Contrstruction, Inc.. Proposed order.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Fri 04/26 1:36 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Ron Kassa Contrstruction, Inc.. Proposed order.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
6 6 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 04/02 2:05 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation
5 5 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 04/02 12:04 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Christopher J. Harayda and Doron Yitzchaki, Attorneys for Callidus Capital Corporation and Midwest Asphalt LLC. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: to Entry of Orders Staying Certain Adversary Proceedings(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
4 4 answer MNB Answer to complaint Wed 03/27 2:12 PM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by Ron Kassa Construction, Inc.. (Burton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 02/27 1:46 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 02/26 8:19 AM
Summons issued on Ron Kassa Construction, Inc. Date Issued 2/26/2019, Answer Due 3/28/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 02/25 4:05 PM
Adversary case 19-04048 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Ron Kassa Construction, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds