Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04049
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2019
Terminated:Jul 02, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ultra Concrete, LLC
16043 County Road 35 West P.O. Box 237
Cokato, MN 55321
Plaintiff
JOHN R STOEBNER TRUSTEE
120 S 6TH ST STE 2500
MINNEAPOLIS, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
14 14 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
13 13 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Tue 07/02 2:25 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by JOHN R STOEBNER TRUSTEE and Ultra Concrete, LLC. Proposed order.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Tue 07/02 3:28 PM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4049. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Tue 07/02 3:29 PM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4049 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
12 12 misc MNB Substitution of attorney Tue 06/04 3:41 PM
Substitution of attorney filed by Andrew J. Steil. Signed by original attorney, Signed by substituted attorney. New attorney: Andrew J. Steil. Original attorney: Amy K. Fiecke (Steil, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
11 11 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Wed 05/01 3:06 PM
Stipulation filed by JOHN R STOEBNER TRUSTEE and Ultra Concrete, LLC. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
10 10 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Fri 04/19 3:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/17/2019 9:30:00 AM ]. File Size [ 3942 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:13 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Wed 04/17 9:46 AM
Minutes re: Related [+] Andrew Stoebner appeared for Plaintiff; Amy Fiecke appeared for Defendant. Matter reported settled. (Kristin)
Related: [-] 8 Order for scheduling conference
Monday, April 08, 2019
9 9 answer MNB Answer to complaint Mon 04/08 3:52 PM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by Ultra Concrete, LLC. (Fiecke, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
8 8 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Mon 04/01 12:46 PM
Order for scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/17/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 31, 2019
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 03/31 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/31/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2019
6 6 order MNB Order (Generic) Fri 03/29 1:54 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Complaint to April 8, 201 Related [+] (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
5 5 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Wed 03/20 11:20 AM
Stipulation filed by Ultra Concrete, LLC and Stoebner, John R. as Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of stipulation: Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint(Fiecke, Amy)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Wed 03/20 11:02 AM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Ultra Concrete, LLC and Amy K. Fiecke.. (Fiecke, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 02/27 1:47 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by JOHN R STOEBNER TRUSTEE.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 02/26 8:55 AM
Summons issued on Ultra Concrete, LLC Date Issued 2/26/2019, Answer Due 3/28/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 02/25 4:12 PM
Adversary case 19-04049 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by JOHN R STOEBNER TRUSTEE against Ultra Concrete, LLC. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds