Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04050
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2019
Terminated:Jun 07, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Davis Industries, Inc., d/b/a Professional Asphalt Services
510 Brimhall
Long Lake, MN 55356
Plaintiff
JOHN R STOEBNER TRUSTEE
120 S 6TH ST STE 2500
MINNEAPOLIS, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
14 14 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2019
13 13 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Fri 06/07 10:48 AM
Notice of dismissal filed by JOHN R STOEBNER TRUSTEE. (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Fri 06/07 12:09 PM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4050. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Fri 06/07 12:10 PM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4050 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
12 12 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Wed 06/05 3:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/5/2019 10:30:00 AM ]. File Size [ 5635 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:44 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Wed 06/05 11:01 AM
Minutes re: Related [+] Andrew J. Stoebner appeared for the Trustee. File stipulation/notice of dismissal within one week or soon thereafter. (DavidT)
Related: [-] 10 Order for status conference
Thursday, May 30, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/31 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/30/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
10 10 order MNB Order for status conference Tue 05/28 3:28 PM
Order for telephonic status conference. Status Conference set for 6/5/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (David T MNB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
9 9 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Thu 04/11 1:00 PM
Stipulation filed by JOHN R STOEBNER TRUSTEE and Davis Industries, Inc., d/b/a Professional Asphalt Services. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/04 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/03/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
7 7 order MNB Order for scheduling conference Mon 04/01 12:48 PM
Order for Telephonic scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/17/2019, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 31, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 03/31 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/31/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2019
5 5 order MNB Order (Generic) Fri 03/29 1:57 PM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to the Complaint to April 11, 2019 Related [+] (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation
Thursday, March 28, 2019
4 4 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Thu 03/28 12:43 PM
Stipulation filed by JOHN R STOEBNER TRUSTEE and Davis Industries, Inc., d/b/a Professional Asphalt. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 02/27 1:48 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by JOHN R STOEBNER TRUSTEE.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 02/26 8:57 AM
Summons issued on Davis Industries, Inc., d/b/a Professional Asphalt Services Date Issued 2/26/2019, Answer Due 3/28/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 02/25 4:19 PM
Adversary case 19-04050 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by JOHN R STOEBNER TRUSTEE against Davis Industries, Inc., d/b/a Professional Asphalt Services. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds