Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04052
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2019
Terminated:Apr 26, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dispatch Trucking, LLC
1121 E. 270th Street
Elko,, MN 55020
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
8 8 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
7 7 misc MNB Stipulation of dismissal Fri 04/26 1:31 PM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Dispatch Trucking, LLC. Proposed order.(Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Fri 04/26 3:18 PM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4052. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Fri 04/26 3:19 PM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4052 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
6 6 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 04/02 2:08 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation
5 5 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 04/02 12:10 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Christopher J. Harayda and Doron Yitzchaki, Attorneys for Callidus Capital Corporation and Midwest Asphalt LLC. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: to Entry of Orders Staying Certain Adversary Proceedings(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2019
4 4 answer MNB Answer to complaint Fri 03/29 1:38 PM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by Dispatch Trucking, LLC. (Jorissen, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 02/27 1:49 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 02/26 12:48 PM
Summons issued on Dispatch Trucking, LLC Date Issued 2/26/2019, Answer Due 3/28/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Tue 02/26 9:51 AM
Adversary case 19-04052 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Dispatch Trucking, LLC. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds