Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:19-ap-04053
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2019
Terminated:May 30, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc., d/b/a All Covered, Inc.
100 Williams Drive
Ramsey, NJ 07446
Plaintiff
John R. Stoebner, Trustee
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Andrew J. Stoebner
Lapp, Libra, Thomson, Stoebner & Pusch,
contact info
John R Stoebner
Lapp Libra Stoebner & Pusch Chartered
contact info
Gordon B. Conn
Lapp Libra Thompson Steobner & Pusch
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 08, 2020
9 9 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/08 2:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 208952. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2019
8 8 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Thu 05/30 12:23 PM
Notice of dismissal filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee (Stoebner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Thu 05/30 1:53 PM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4053. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Thu 05/30 1:54 PM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4053 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
7 7 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Wed 05/01 3:02 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc.. Nature of stipulation: Settlement Agreement and Release(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/22 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/22/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
5 5 order MNB Order (Generic) Wed 03/20 4:40 PM
Order extending time for Defendant to answer or respond to the complaint Related [+] (Whitney MNB)
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
4 4 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 03/19 2:51 PM
Stipulation filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee and William Kuo, attorney for Konica Minolta Business Solutions, U.S.A., Inc.. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
3 3 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 02/27 1:50 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by John R. Stoebner, Trustee.(Stoebner, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 02/26 12:50 PM
Summons issued on Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc., d/b/a All Covered, Inc. Date Issued 2/26/2019, Answer Due 3/28/2019 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Tue 02/26 9:59 AM
Adversary case 19-04053 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by John R. Stoebner, Trustee against Konica Minolta Business Solutions U.S.A., Inc., d/b/a All Covered, Inc.. No Fee. (Stoebner, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trustee's statement of insuffient funds